EP2566812 - METHOD OF PREPARING POROUS CARBON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Ltd Globe House 1 Water Street London, WC2R 3LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Ltd Globe House 1 Water Street London, WC2R 3LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANTON, Peter c/o British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | 02 /
DAWSON, Elizabeth c/o University of Huddersfield Queensgate Huddersfield HD1 3DH / GB | 03 /
PARKES, Gareth c/o University of Huddersfield Queensgate Huddersfield HD1 3DH / GB | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Gill, Siân Victoria, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2013/11] | Application number, filing date | 11754714.1 | 06.05.2011 | WO2011GB50882 | Priority number, date | GB20100007667 | 07.05.2010 Original published format: GB 201007667 | [2013/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011148156 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2566812 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/08, A24D3/16 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
A24D3/163 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/324 (EP,KR);
B01J20/20 (KR);
C01B32/354 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PORÖSEM KOHLENSTOFF | [2013/11] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING POROUS CARBON | [2013/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE CARBONE POREUX | [2013/11] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 28.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/20] | 08.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3817874 (WENNERBERG A, et al) [X] 1,6-8,12,13 * claim 1 * * column 1, line 71 - column 2, line 20 * * column 2, line 71 - column 3, line 28 * * examples 2, 4b * [I] 9,10; | [X]WO2004047571 (FILTRONA INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 12-16 * claims 1,2,5-8 * * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 6 * * page 8, Table *; | [XP]WO2010103323 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,12-16 * claims 1,2,4,6-15 * * page 3, line 26 - page 7, line 8 * * examples 1,2 * | [XI] - HU Z ET AL, "A simple method for developing mesoporosity in activated carbon", SEPARATION AND PURIFICATION TECHNOLOGY 20030401 ELSEVIER NL, (20030401), vol. 31, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1016/S1383-5866(02)00148-X, pages 47 - 52, XP002662332 [X] 1,2,4,5,12,13 * abstract * * pages 48-49, "2. Experimental section" & "Table 1" * * page 51, "4. Conclusion" * [I] 3,7-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/DOI:10.1016/S1383-5866(02)00148-X | [XI] - GONG G-Z ET AL, "Regulation of pore size distribution in coal-based activated carbon", XINXING TAN CAILIAO/ NEW CARBON MATERIALS JUNE 2009 EDITORIAL BOARD OF NEW CARBON MATERIALS CHN, (200906), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 141 - 146, XP002662333 [X] 1,12,13 * abstract * * page 141, right-hand column, last paragraph * * page 142, "2.1 Sample preparation" * * page 143, left-hand column, last paragraph to page 144, right-hand column. * [I] 7-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1872-5805(08)60043-8 | [X] - BRANTON P ET AL, "The effect of carbon pore structure on the adsorption of cigarette smoke vapour phase compounds", CARBON, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 47, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.CARBON.2008.12.003, ISSN 0008-6223, (20090401), pages 1005 - 1011, (20090211), XP025940735 [X] 12-16 * page 1006, "2. Experimental" * * page 1007, "table 1" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2008.12.003 | by applicant | - ADSOLPTIOL1, (2008), vol. 14, pages 335 - 341 |