EP2583536 - LIGHT-EMITTING APPARATUS AND LIGHTING APPLIANCE PROVIDED WITH THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAGI, Takaaki c/o Philips Electronics Japan Ltd. Philips Bldg. 2-13-37, Kohnan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8507 / JP | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/07] | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2013/17] | Van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 11754735.6 | 16.06.2011 | WO2011IB52611 | Priority number, date | JP20100139890 | 18.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010139890 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011158196 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2583536 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2583536 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
H05B45/40 (EP,US);
H05B45/54 (US);
H05B45/37 (EP,US);
Y02B20/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG UND DAMIT AUSGESTATTETE BELEUCHTUNGSANWENDUNG | [2013/17] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING APPARATUS AND LIGHTING APPLIANCE PROVIDED WITH THE SAME | [2013/17] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ET APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE POURVU DUDIT APPAREIL ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 07.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2011 | AL | 11.02.2015 | AT | 11.02.2015 | BE | 11.02.2015 | BG | 11.02.2015 | CY | 11.02.2015 | CZ | 11.02.2015 | DK | 11.02.2015 | EE | 11.02.2015 | FI | 11.02.2015 | HR | 11.02.2015 | LT | 11.02.2015 | LV | 11.02.2015 | MC | 11.02.2015 | MK | 11.02.2015 | MT | 11.02.2015 | NL | 11.02.2015 | PL | 11.02.2015 | PT | 11.02.2015 | RO | 11.02.2015 | RS | 11.02.2015 | SE | 11.02.2015 | SI | 11.02.2015 | SK | 11.02.2015 | SM | 11.02.2015 | TR | 11.02.2015 | NO | 11.05.2015 | GR | 12.05.2015 | IS | 11.06.2015 | IE | 16.06.2015 | LU | 16.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.06.2011 | |
AT | 11.02.2015 | ||
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MK | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PT | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
SM | 11.02.2015 | ||
TR | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 16.06.2011 | |
AT | 11.02.2015 | ||
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
SM | 11.02.2015 | ||
TR | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 11.02.2015 | |
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 11.02.2015 | |
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 11.02.2015 | |
NO | 11.05.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006279262 (CHIANG YUNG-HSIN [TW], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2009301952 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]JP2010080844 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2009301952 | JP2010080844 |