EP2608782 - NOVEL USE OF LEFLUNOMIDE AND MALONONITRILAMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Algiax Pharmaceuticals GmbH Max-Planck-Straße 15a 40699 Erkrath / DE | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOOPMANS, Guido Romeinseweg 25 NL-6135 JA Sittard / NL | 02 /
HASSE, Birgit Katernberger Str. 171 42115 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
MÜLLNER, Stefan Hagebuttenweg 21 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Roth, Andy Stefan Dr. Roth Patentanwaltskanzlei Kaistrasse 5 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Roth, Andy Stefan Dr. Roth Patentanwaltskanzlei Life Science Columbusstrasse 22 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11754832.1 | 23.08.2011 | [2016/26] | WO2011EP04218 | Priority number, date | EP20100008802 | 24.08.2010 Original published format: EP 10008802 | US20100376453P | 24.08.2010 Original published format: US 376453 P | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012025217 | Date: | 01.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2608782 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2608782 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/165, A61K31/42, A61P25/00 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/277 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE ANWENDUNGEN VON LEFLUNOMID UND MALONONITRILAMIDEN | [2016/08] | English: | NOVEL USE OF LEFLUNOMIDE AND MALONONITRILAMIDES | [2013/27] | French: | NOUVELLES UTILISATIONS DE LEFLUNOMIDE ET MALONONITRILAMIDES | [2016/08] |
Former [2013/27] | NEUARTIGE VERWENDUNG VON LEFLUNOMID UND MALONONITRILAMIDEN | ||
Former [2013/27] | NOUVELLE UTILISATION DE LÉFLUNOMIDE ET DE MALONONITRILAMIDES | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 09.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2011 | AL | 29.06.2016 | BE | 29.06.2016 | CY | 29.06.2016 | CZ | 29.06.2016 | EE | 29.06.2016 | FI | 29.06.2016 | HR | 29.06.2016 | LT | 29.06.2016 | LV | 29.06.2016 | MC | 29.06.2016 | MK | 29.06.2016 | PL | 29.06.2016 | RO | 29.06.2016 | RS | 29.06.2016 | SI | 29.06.2016 | SK | 29.06.2016 | SM | 29.06.2016 | TR | 29.06.2016 | IE | 23.08.2016 | LU | 23.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | BG | 29.09.2016 | NO | 29.09.2016 | GR | 30.09.2016 | IS | 29.10.2016 | PT | 31.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.08.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MK | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
TR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 23.08.2016 | ||
LU | 23.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.08.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MK | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
TR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 23.08.2016 | ||
LU | 23.08.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.08.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MK | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 23.08.2016 | ||
LU | 23.08.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 23.08.2016 | ||
LU | 23.08.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 29.06.2016 | |
NO | 29.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2003223960 (WETTSTEIN JOSEPH [US]) [X] 2,12,13,15,16 * claims 1-32 * * figure 1 * [I] 3,7; | [XP]EP2314291 (SANOFI AVENTIS [FR]) [XP] 2,11-13,15,16 * the whole document *; | [XI]US5556870 (WEITHMANN KLAUS U [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,11-13,15,16 * claim 1 * [I] 7; | [XI]WO2009133141 (PHARNEXT [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,11-13,15,16 * the whole document * [I] 7; | [XI]WO0050079 (TOBINICK EDWARD L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-13,15,16,18-20 * page 5, paragraph 2 * * claims 27,32,34,25,47 * [I] 7; | [I]EP0821952 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [I] 4,5,7,14,17 * claim 4 *; | [XI] - SCHORLEMMER H U ET AL, "Therapeutic activity of malononitrilamides (MNA 279 and MNA 715) on acute and chronic, relapsing, experimental, allergic encephalomyelitis (EAE)", DRUGS UNDER EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 23, no. 5-6, ISSN 0378-6501, pages 175 - 181, XP009153516 [X] 3-5,11-17 * the whole document * [I] 7 | [XI] - PETTY MARGARET ET AL, "Teriflunomide Treatment Reduces Infiltration of Macrophages, T Cells and B Cells, and Increases Survival of Oligodendrocytes in the Spinal Cord of the Dark Agouti Rat Model of Experimental Allergic Encephalomyelitis", NEUROLOGY, & 62ND ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-ACADEMY-OF-NEUROLOGY; TORONTO, CANADA; APRIL 10 -17, 2010, (201003), vol. 74, no. 9, Suppl. 2, ISSN 0028-3878, page A415, XP009153517 [X] 2,8,11-13,15,16,18,19 * the whole document * [I] 7 | [XI] - BELEN D ET AL, "Leflunomide prevents vasospasm secondary to subarachnoid haemorrhage", ACTA NEUROCHIRURGICA ; THE EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NEUROSURGERY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, VI, (20070917), vol. 149, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S00701-007-1275-1, ISSN 0942-0940, pages 1041 - 1048, XP019565304 [X] 1-3,11-13,15,16 * the whole document * [I] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00701-007-1275-1 | [I] - COHEN JEAN-DAVID ET AL, "Leflunomide-induced aseptic meningitis.", JOINT, BONE, SPINE : REVUE DU RHUMATISME MAY 2004 LNKD- PUBMED:15182800, (200405), vol. 71, no. 3, ISSN 1297-319X, pages 243 - 245, XP002662326 [I] 1-3,7,11-13,15,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1297-319X(03)00127-1 | by applicant | US5532259 | WO9117748 | WO2004006834 | US3845770 | US3916899 | US3536809 | US3598123 | US4008719 | US5674533 | US5059595 | US5591767 | US5120548 | US5073543 | US5639476 | US5354556 | US5733566 | US5134127 | - Burger's Medicinal Chemistry and Drug Discovery, (1995), vol. 172-178, pages 949 - 982 | - WILEN, S. H. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1977), vol. 33, page 2725 | - WILEN, S. H., Tables of Resolving Agents and Optical Resolutions, UNIV. OF NOTRE DAME PRESS, (1972), page 268 | - Oxford Dictionary of Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS | - JENS T. CARSTENSEN, Drug Stability: Principles & Practice, MARCEL DEKKER, (1995), pages 379 - 80 | - BASSO, D. M. ET AL., "A sensitive and reliable locomotor rating scale for open field testing in rats", J NEUROTRAUMA., (1995), vol. 12, pages 1 - 21, XP009036806 | - DAVIS, J. P ET AL., "The immunosuppressive metabolite of leflunomide is a potent inhibitor of human dihydroorotate dehydrogenase", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, pages 1270 - 3 | - GREENE, S. ET AL., "Inhibition of dihydroorotate dehydrogenase by the immunosuppressive agent leflunomide", BIOCHEM PHARMACOL., (1995), vol. 50, doi:doi:10.1016/0006-2952(95)00255-X, pages 861 - 7, XP002074075 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(95)00255-X | - HIMES, B. T. ET AL., "Recovery of function following grafting of human bone marrow-derived stromal cells into the injured spinal cord", NEUROREHABIL NEURAL REPAIR., (2006), vol. 20, pages 278 - 96 | - KUO, E. A. ET AL., "Synthesis, structure-activity relationships, and pharmacokinetic properties of dihydroorotate dehydrogenase inhibitors: 2-cyano-3-cyclopropyl-3-hydroxy-N-[3'-methyl-4'-(trifluoromethyl)phenyl ] propenamide and related compounds", J MED CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, doi:doi:10.1021/jm9604437, pages 4608 - 21, XP000196780 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9604437 | - SHUMSKY, J. S. ET AL., "Delayed transplantation of fibroblasts genetically modified to secrete BDNF and NT-3 into a spinal cord injury site is associated with limited recovery of function", EXP NEUROL., (2003), vol. 184, pages 114 - 30 | - WILLIAMSON, R. A. ET AL., "Dihydroorotate dehydrogenase is a high affinity binding protein for A77 1726 and mediator of a range of biological effects of the immunomodulatory compound", J BIOL CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 22467 - 72 | - ZIELINSKI, T. ET AL., "Leflunomide, a reversible inhibitor of pyrimidine biosynthesis?", INFLAMM RES., (1995), vol. 44, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1007/BF01782026, pages 207 - 8, XP002061643 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01782026 |