EP2616531 - REFINED VEGETABLE OIL AND A METHOD OF PRODUCING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palsgaard A/S Palsgaardvej 10 7130 Juelsminde / DK | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORN, Viggo Creemers Grundvej 5 DK-7140 Stouby / DK | 02 /
NIELSEN, Lars Preuss Bygaden 42 DK-7130 Juelsminde / DK | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2017/02] |
Former [2013/30] | Østergaard, Steen Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Application number, filing date | 11755341.2 | 13.09.2011 | [2017/02] | WO2011EP65864 | Priority number, date | US20100382539P | 14.09.2010 Original published format: US 382539 P | EP20100176400 | 13.09.2010 Original published format: EP 10176400 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012035020 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2616531 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2616531 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C11B1/10, C11B3/00, C11B3/06, C11B3/08 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
C11B3/006 (EP,US);
C11B3/001 (EP,US);
C11B3/06 (EP,US);
C11B3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Extension states | BA | 10.04.2013 | ME | 10.04.2013 | Title | German: | RAFFINIERTES PFLANZENÖL UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2013/30] | English: | REFINED VEGETABLE OIL AND A METHOD OF PRODUCING IT | [2013/30] | French: | HUILE VÉGÉTALE RAFFINÉE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUIRE | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 09.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2011 | AL | 11.01.2017 | AT | 11.01.2017 | CY | 11.01.2017 | CZ | 11.01.2017 | DK | 11.01.2017 | EE | 11.01.2017 | ES | 11.01.2017 | FI | 11.01.2017 | HR | 11.01.2017 | IT | 11.01.2017 | LT | 11.01.2017 | LV | 11.01.2017 | MC | 11.01.2017 | MK | 11.01.2017 | PL | 11.01.2017 | RO | 11.01.2017 | RS | 11.01.2017 | SI | 11.01.2017 | SK | 11.01.2017 | SM | 11.01.2017 | TR | 11.01.2017 | BG | 11.04.2017 | NO | 11.04.2017 | GR | 12.04.2017 | IS | 11.05.2017 | PT | 11.05.2017 | IE | 13.09.2017 | LU | 13.09.2017 | MT | 13.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | FR | 02.10.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 13.09.2011 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MK | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
TR | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 13.09.2011 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MK | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 13.09.2011 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.09.2011 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 13.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5414100 (AYORINDE FOLAHAN O [US], et al) [X] 16 * column 2, lines 24-51; claims 1-17; tables 1-9 * | [XY] - BHATTACHARYYA A C ET AL, "Refining of high FFA rice bran oil by mixed solvent-alkali neutralisation process.", FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANkFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. FS-1986-09-N-0016, XP002630193 [X] 16 * abstract * [Y] 1-15 | [XY] - LI GUI-HUA ET AL, "Study of the esterification of FFA in rice bran oil containing high acid value with glycerin.", FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANkFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. FS-2002-11-Ne0686, XP002630194 [X] 16 * abstract * [Y] 1-15 | [XY] - KRISHNA DE B ET AL, "Effect of different degumming processes and some nontraditional neutralizing agent on refining of RBO.", FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANkFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. FS-2010-07-Ne1024, XP002630195 [X] 16 * abstract * [Y] 1-15 | [X] - KORNKANOK ARYUSUK ET AL, "Effects of crude rice bran oil components on alkali-refining loss.", FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANkFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. FS-2008-07-Me1831, XP002630196 [X] 16 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9818888 | - "Codex Alimentarius; Fats", Oils and Related Products, FAO/WHO ROME, (1993), vol. 8, page 2 |