EP2593200 - DISTILLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aquaback Technologies Inc. 6 Southgate Drive Nashua, NH 03062-2204 / US | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEBUHR, William, H. 6 Southgate Drive Nashua NH 03062-2204 / US | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 11755461.8 | 19.07.2011 | WO2011US44497 | Priority number, date | US20100366448P | 21.07.2010 Original published format: US 366448 P | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012012397 | Date: | 26.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2593200 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D1/22, C02F1/04, C02F1/08 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
B01D1/227 (EP,US);
B01D1/22 (CN);
B01D5/009 (US);
B01D1/225 (EP,US);
B01D1/2887 (EP,US);
B01D1/30 (CN);
B01D3/00 (CN);
B01D5/006 (EP,US);
C02F1/042 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Title | German: | DESTILLATOR | [2013/21] | English: | DISTILLER | [2013/21] | French: | DISTILLATEUR | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 06.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2019 | 31.07.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3190817 (NEUGEBAUER FRANZ J, et al) [X] 1,68 * abstract * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 5 * * column 9, line 47 - line 60 * * column 11, line 50 - line 58 * * column 11, line 70 - line 3, paragraph 12 * [I] 2-15,69-82; | [XI]US3695327 (WIDMER FRITZ) [X] 1-3,68 * abstract * * column 4, line 39 - line 50 * * column 5, line 26 - line 38 * * column 5, line 49 - line 52 * * column 6, line 1 - line 18 *[I] 4-15,69-82 | by applicant | US20110366448 |