EP2548847 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING FRESH WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | [2013/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIGUCHI, Masahide c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
TAKABATAKE, Hiroo c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
MAEDA, Tomohiro c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11756156.3 | 09.03.2011 | WO2011JP55538 | Priority number, date | JP20100057113 | 15.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010057113 | [2013/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011114967 | Date: | 22.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2548847 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/44, B01D61/02, B01D61/06, B01D61/12 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
C02F1/44 (EP,US);
B01D61/025 (EP,US);
B01D61/06 (EP,US);
B01D61/12 (EP,US);
B01D2311/04 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
C02F1/444 (EP,US);
C02F1/445 (EP,US);
C02F1/66 (EP,US);
C02F1/683 (EP,US);
C02F1/76 (EP,US);
C02F2209/03 (EP,US);
C02F2209/40 (EP,US);
C02F2303/10 (EP,US);
C02F2303/185 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FRISCHWASSER | [2013/04] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING FRESH WATER | [2013/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'EAU DOUCE | [2013/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2012 | Translation filed | 13.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 01.10.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2005224651 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2007152265 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2008100219 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]JP2008126137 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH04137795 | JP2001046842 | JP2001239134 |