EP2549283 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, DETECTION METHOD, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/04] | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, DETECTION METHOD, AND PROGRAM | ||
[2021/12] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyushu Institute of Technology 1-1, Sensui-cho Tobata-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 804-8550 / JP | For all designated states National University Corporation Nara Institute of Science and Technology 8916-5, Takayamacho Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0192 / JP | For all designated states Tokyo Metropolitan University 2-8-1, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Kyushu Institute of Technology 1-1, Sensui-cho Tobata-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 804-8550 / JP | ||
For all designated states National University Corporation Nara Institute of Science and Technology 8916-5, Takayamacho Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0192 / JP | |||
For all designated states Tokyo Metropolitan University 2-8-1, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Yasuo c/o Kyushu Institute of Technology 680-4, Kawazu Iizuka-shi Fukuoka 820-8502 / JP | 02 /
KAJIHARA, Seiji c/o Kyushu Institute of Technology 680-4, Kawazu Iizuka-shi Fukuoka 820-8502 / JP | 03 /
INOUE, Michiko c/o National University Corporation Nara Institute of Science and Technology 8916-5, Takayama-cho Ikoma-shi Nara 630-0192 / JP | 04 /
YONEDA, Tomokazu c/o National University Corporation Nara Institute of Science and Technology 8916-5, Takayama-cho Ikoma-shi Nara 630-0192 / JP | 05 /
YI, Hyunbean c/o National University Corporation Nara Institute of Science and Technology 8916-5, Takayama-cho Ikoma-shi Nara 630-0192 / JP | 06 /
MIURA, Yukiya c/o Tokyo Metropolitan University 6-6, Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0065 / JP | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Application number, filing date | 11756223.1 | 14.03.2011 | WO2011JP55900 | Priority number, date | JP20100057310 | 15.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010057310 | [2013/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011115038 | Date: | 22.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2549283 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28, G01R31/30 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
G01R31/2884 (EP,KR,US);
G01R19/2503 (KR);
G01R19/252 (KR);
G01R31/2856 (EP,US);
G01R31/2874 (KR);
G01R31/2879 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2013/04] | G01R31/28, H01L21/822, H01L27/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT, ERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/12] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, DETECTION METHOD, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2021/12] |
Former [2013/04] | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT SOWIE ERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM DAFÜR | ||
Former [2013/04] | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, DETECTION METHOD, AND PROGRAM | ||
Former [2013/04] | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION ET PROGRAMME | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2012 | Translation filed | 11.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 22.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/52] | 10.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009108863 (GONZALEZ CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0044] *; | [A]US5795068 (CONN JR ROBERT O [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US2006223201 (LIU JONATHAN H [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0066] * | International search | [A]JPH09292436 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH07191095 (TEKTRONIX INC); | [A]JPH0961503 (ADVANTEST CORP); | [A]JP2003068865 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JP2003068865 | JP2010524101 | - SATO ET AL., "A Survey of Approaches for High Field Reliability", REAJ, vol. 31, no. 7, pages 514 - 519 | - Y. SATO ET AL., "A Circuit Failure Prediction Mechanism (DART) for High Field Reliability", THE 8TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ASIC, (2009), pages 581 - 584, XP031578952 | - T. VO ET AL., "Design for Board and System Level Structure Test and Diagnosis", PROC. INTL. TEST CONF., (2006), pages 1 - 10 | - Y. LI ET AL., "CASP: Concurrent Autonomous Chip Self-Test Using Stored Test Patterns", PROC. DESIGN AUTOMATION AND TEST IN EUROPE, (2008), pages 885 - 890, XP031241898 | - O. KHAN ET AL., "A Self-Adaptive System Architecture to Address transistor Aging", PROC. DESIGN AUTOMATION AND TEST IN EUROPE, (2009), doi:doi:10.1109/DATE.2009.5090637, pages 81 - 86, XP032317470 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DATE.2009.5090637 |