EP2612348 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING P-DOPED SILICON LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/28] | P-DOPED SILICON LAYERS | ||
[2017/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2017/48] |
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIEBER, Stephan Marie-Juchacz-Strasse 7 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
PATZ, Matthias Lindhorststrasse 34 46240 Bottrop / DE | 03 /
STÜGER, Harald Eichenweg 23/7 A-8042 Graz / AT | 04 /
LEHMKUHL, Jasmin Johannesstraße 51 45721 Haltern am See / DE | [2013/28] | Application number, filing date | 11757199.2 | 19.08.2011 | [2017/48] | WO2011EP64279 | Priority number, date | DE20101040231 | 03.09.2010 Original published format: DE102010040231 | [2013/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012028476 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2612348 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2612348 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/228, H01L21/02, C07F9/50, H01L31/18, C23C18/12 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
H01L21/228 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/12 (KR);
C23C18/1204 (EP,US);
C23C18/122 (EP,US);
C23C18/1225 (EP,US);
C23C18/143 (EP,US);
H01L21/0237 (EP,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US);
H01L21/02579 (EP,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
H01L21/02628 (EP,US);
H01L29/16 (EP,US);
H01L31/068 (EP,US);
H01L31/18 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG P-DOTIERTER SILICIUMSCHICHTEN | [2017/26] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING P-DOPED SILICON LAYERS | [2017/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DES COUCHES DE SILICIUM DOPÉES DE TYPE P | [2017/26] |
Former [2013/28] | P-DOTIERTE SILICIUMSCHICHTEN | ||
Former [2013/28] | P-DOPED SILICON LAYERS | ||
Former [2013/28] | COUCHES DE SILICIUM DOPÉES P | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 10.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15185644.0 / EP2991102 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2011 | AL | 29.11.2017 | CY | 29.11.2017 | CZ | 29.11.2017 | DK | 29.11.2017 | EE | 29.11.2017 | FI | 29.11.2017 | HR | 29.11.2017 | LT | 29.11.2017 | LV | 29.11.2017 | MC | 29.11.2017 | MK | 29.11.2017 | MT | 29.11.2017 | PL | 29.11.2017 | PT | 29.11.2017 | RO | 29.11.2017 | RS | 29.11.2017 | SE | 29.11.2017 | SI | 29.11.2017 | SK | 29.11.2017 | SM | 29.11.2017 | TR | 29.11.2017 | BG | 28.02.2018 | NO | 28.02.2018 | GR | 01.03.2018 | IS | 29.03.2018 | AT | 19.08.2018 | IE | 19.08.2018 | LU | 19.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
AT | 19.08.2018 | ||
IE | 19.08.2018 | ||
LU | 19.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
AT | 19.08.2018 | ||
IE | 19.08.2018 | ||
LU | 19.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
AT | 19.08.2018 | ||
IE | 19.08.2018 | ||
LU | 19.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
AT | 19.08.2018 | ||
IE | 19.08.2018 | ||
LU | 19.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 19.08.2018 | ||
LU | 19.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
LU | 19.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 29.11.2017 | |
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 29.11.2017 | |
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US7674926 (GUO WENZHUO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,10,11,14 * abstract * * column 1 - column 2 * * column 3, line 23 - line 25 * * column 9, line 17 - column 10, line 50 * [I] 4,7-9,12,13; | [XI]EP1284306 (JSR CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0103] * [I] 4; | [A]US2008160265 (HIESLMAIR HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]EP0130311 (ALLIED CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 8 *; | [A]US7314513 (ZUERCHER FABIO [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 17 - column 18 * | by applicant | US5866471 | EP1085579 | EP1357154 | EP1640342 | US2008022897 | JP2002100576 |