EP2640963 - COVER DEVICE FOR A SPARK PLUG SHAFT AND OPTICAL FIBRE DEVICE FOR A LASER SPARK PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NUEBEL, Karl-Heinz Jahnstr. 2/1 75397 Simmozheim / DE | 02 /
WEINROTTER, Martin Franz-Schubert Str. 74 70195 Stuttgart-Botnang / DE | 03 /
VOGEL, Manfred Lerchenstr. 17 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 04 /
BARTH, Frank Haeldenstr. 93 71732 Tamm / DE | [2013/39] | Application number, filing date | 11757285.9 | 13.09.2011 | WO2011EP65814 | Priority number, date | DE20101043890 | 15.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010043890 | [2013/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012065763 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2640963 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02P23/04, F02F1/24, H01S3/067, H01T13/08 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
F02F1/242 (EP,US);
H01T13/06 (US);
F02P23/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | ABDECKVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN ZÜNDKERZENSCHACHT UND LICHTLEITEREINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE LASERZÜNDKERZE | [2013/39] | English: | COVER DEVICE FOR A SPARK PLUG SHAFT AND OPTICAL FIBRE DEVICE FOR A LASER SPARK PLUG | [2013/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECOUVREMENT D'UN LOGEMENT DE BOUGIE D'ALLUMAGE ET DISPOSITIF À FIBRES OPTIQUES DESTINÉ À UNE BOUGIE D'ALLUMAGE LASER | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 13.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE432999 (NICOLAI VON GRIBOJEDOFF) [X] 1,2,7 * figures 1,2 *; | [XYI]FR2655386 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 8 [I] 3-6; | [XYI]EP1253688 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * figures 3,4,8 * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0101] * [Y] 8 [I] 3,4,6; | [XY]US2005206288 (KISHIMOTO KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0040] , [0041] * * figure 3 * [Y] 8; | [XY]FR2894724 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [X] 1,2,7 * line 4 - page 7, line 22 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 8; | [XY]DE102006029989 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 9,15 * paragraph [0024] * * figure 2 * [Y] 10-12; | [Y]DE102006062309 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0023] * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102009000911 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 9-15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053] ** figure 4 *; | [XP]DE102009003053 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [XP] 9,15 * the whole document *; | [YP]US2011069376 (DIENING ANDREAS [US]) [YP] 10-12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] * * paragraph [0015] * |