EP2619011 - EMBOSSING MACHINE INCLUDING A PLATEN PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOBST MEX SA Route de Faraz 3 1031 Mex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states BOBST MEX SA Route de Faraz 3 CH-1031 Mex / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE GAILLANDE, Christophe Route de Buyère 1 CH -1030 Bussigny / CH | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge p.a. Bobst Mex SA Case postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [2013/31] | Application number, filing date | 11758411.0 | 21.09.2011 | WO2011EP04725 | Priority number, date | EP20100010182 | 22.09.2010 Original published format: EP 10010182 | [2013/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012038079 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2619011 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2619011 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B41F1/54, B41F16/00, B41F19/06 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
B41F19/068 (EP,US);
B41F1/54 (KR);
B30B15/00 (US);
B26D5/16 (US);
B26D5/18 (US);
B30B1/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRÄGEMASCHINE MIT EINER PLATTENPRESSE | [2013/31] | English: | EMBOSSING MACHINE INCLUDING A PLATEN PRESS | [2013/31] | French: | MACHINE D'ESTAMPAGE COMPRENANT UNE PRESSE A PLATINES | [2013/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 13.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2011 | AL | 23.07.2014 | AT | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | DK | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | FI | 23.07.2014 | HR | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | MK | 23.07.2014 | MT | 23.07.2014 | NL | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | RS | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | SM | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | IE | 21.09.2014 | LU | 21.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | NO | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.09.2011 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MK | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 21.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 21.09.2011 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 21.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.09.2011 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 21.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 21.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 21.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 21.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 21.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US1558156 (FORD STUART M) [X] 1-4* page 1, lines 26-59; figure 1 *; | [X]US3046875 (HENRI BOBST) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 4; figure 1 *; | [X]US2004103799 (LIU TIAN-SHENG [TW]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019]; figures 2,3 * |