Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2609071 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2011295171 CN201180041109 EP11758422 EP2011064411W JP2013525280 KR20137007277 US201113818576 US201514739197



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012025502Global Dossier 01.03.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9802887Global Dossier 31.10.2017B2
US2015274650 01.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201313818576 22.02.2013
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
US201514739197 15.06.2015
WO2011EP64411 22.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9085529Global Dossier 21.07.2015B2
US2013158275 20.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
WO2011EP64411 22.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20130106374Global Dossier 27.09.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
WO2011EP64411 22.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6002133BGlobal Dossier 05.10.2016B2
JP2013537555 03.10.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
WO2011EP64411 22.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103080072BGlobal Dossier 16.03.2016B
CN103080072 01.05.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
CN201180041109 22.08.2011
WO2011EP64411 22.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011295171BGlobal Dossier 15.01.2015B2
AU2011295171 21.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
WO2011EP64411 22.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2609071Global Dossier 21.09.2016B1
EP2609071 03.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
WO2011EP64411 22.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112013004179 10.05.2016A2
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
WO2011EP64411 22.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2806501 01.03.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
WO2011EP64411 22.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2608780T 17.04.2017T3
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
WO2011EP64411 22.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2013002149 03.04.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
WO2011EP64411 22.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2609071T 31.03.2017T3
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PT2609071T 26.12.2016T
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2573824 27.01.2016C2
RU2013112856 27.09.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
WO2011EP64411 22.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2609071T 31.01.2017T1
Priority number Date
WO2010CN76249 23.08.2010
EP11758422 22.08.2011
WO2011EP64411 22.08.2011