EP2622938 - TRANSPARENT PANEL HAVING A HEATABLE COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 18 avenue d' Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LISINSKI, Susanne Zweibrücker Strasse 6 50739 Köln / DE | 02 /
PHAN, Dang Cuong Alexanderstrasse 95 52062 Aachen / DE | 03 /
SCHALL, Günther Am Sandberg 19 52372 Kreuzau / DE | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Gebauer, Dieter Edmund Splanemann Patentanwälte mbB Rumfordstraße 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Gebauer, Dieter Edmund Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstraße 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11758425.0 | 26.08.2011 | [2016/45] | WO2011EP64708 | Priority number, date | EP20110169654 | 11.06.2011 Original published format: EP 11169654 | EP20100175987 | 09.09.2010 Original published format: EP 10175987 | [2013/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012031908 | Date: | 15.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2622938 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2622938 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/84 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
H05B3/84 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10174 (EP,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
H01C17/06 (US);
H01R43/00 (US);
H05B1/00 (US);
H05B3/03 (US);
H05B2203/008 (EP,US);
H05B2203/016 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49083 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49099 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49204 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTE SCHEIBE MIT HEIZBESCHICHTUNG | [2013/32] | English: | TRANSPARENT PANEL HAVING A HEATABLE COATING | [2013/32] | French: | VITRE TRANSPARENTE MUNIE D'UN REVÊTEMENT CHAUFFANT | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 15.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2011 | AL | 09.11.2016 | CY | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | HR | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | MK | 09.11.2016 | MT | 09.11.2016 | RS | 09.11.2016 | SI | 09.11.2016 | SM | 09.11.2016 | BG | 09.02.2017 | NO | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 26.08.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.08.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.08.2011 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 09.11.2016 | |
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XP]EP2334141 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [XP] 1-14 * figures 1,3-7 *; | [YPA]WO2011006743 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR], et al) [YP] 1-8,10,13,14 * figures 1-6 * [A] 9,11,12; | [Y]US2006186105 (VOELTZEL CHARLES S [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,10,13,14 * figures 1,9 *; | [Y]GB2381179 (PILKINGTON PLC [GB]) [Y] 1,2,4-8,10,13,14 * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]DE102007008833 (SAINT GOBAIN SEKURIT D GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,5 * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2007083038 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR], et al) [Y] 1,5 * figure 2 *; | [YP]DE102009025888 (SAINT GOBAIN SEKURIT D GMBH [DE]) [YP] 3 * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE102008018147 | DE102008029986 | EP2334141 | US2006186105 | GB2381179 | DE102007008833 | WO2007083038 | DE202008017611U | EP0847965 |