EP2550858 - SOAKER AND/OR DRIP IRRIGATION DEVICE SUITABLE FOR PLANT POTS AND OUTDOOR SOIL PLANTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bandim Activities, S.L. C/ M ªJesús Francés Bravo 46 08184 Palau-Solitá Plegamans {Barcelona) / ES | For all designated states Potas Paredes, Francisco C/ Merce, 3 bis, 1, 1 08291 Ripollet (Barcelona) / ES | For all designated states Michel Camps, Carles C/ Córsega, 202, 4, 3 08036 Barcelona / ES | [2013/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIMO DELGADO, Amador C/ Valle de Mena 10 E-47008 Valladoid / ES | 02 /
OLLER OLLER, Georgina C/ Pare Rodés 24 E- 08130 Sta. Perpetua de Mogoda (Barcelona) / ES | 03 /
OLLER OLLER, Roger C/Casal dels Mogoda 70 E-08130 Sta. Perpetua de Mogoda (Barcelona) / ES | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 11758856.6 | 23.03.2011 | WO2011ES00090 | Priority number, date | ES20100000303U | 24.03.2010 Original published format: ES 201000303 U | [2013/05] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011117442 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | ES | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2550858 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01G27/00 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
A01G27/006 (EP,US);
A01G29/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Title | German: | BENETZUNGS- UND/ODER TROPFENBEWÄSSERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR PFLANZENTÖPFE UND AUSSENBODENBEPFLANZUNGEN | [2013/05] | English: | SOAKER AND/OR DRIP IRRIGATION DEVICE SUITABLE FOR PLANT POTS AND OUTDOOR SOIL PLANTING | [2013/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ARROSAGE PAR EXSUDATION ET/OU GOUTTE À GOUTTE, À UTILISER AVEC DES POTS DE FLEURS ET DANS DES PLANTATIONS EXTÉRIEURES EN TERRE | [2013/05] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2012 | Translation filed | 24.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/11] | 11.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US1029107 (COULS GEORGE R [US]); | [A]ES371670 (INTERIOR GARDENS LIMITED [GB]); | [Y]US4843757 (O'HARA JR JAMES C [US]); | [A]GB2253328 (MCGOVERN ANTHONY); | [Y]GB2290933 (FIGGINS PETER LEONARD [GB], et al); | [X]GB2349791 (DANIELS SEYMOUR CEMOUN [GB]); | [A]US2002017055 (NALBANDIAN A EUGENE [US], et al); | [A]US2006086045 (JENSEN HAROLD [US], et al) |