EP2550265 - PYRIDAZINE COMPOUNDS FOR CONTROLLING INVERTEBRATE PESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2016/49] |
Former [2013/05] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Vezouet, Ronan Neckarpromenade 20 68167 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Sörgel, Sebastian Marienstr. 19 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Defieber, Christian Tullastraße 13 68165 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
Groß, Steffen Marie-Juchacz Allee 201 67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
Körber, Karsten Hintere Lisgewann 26 69214 Eppelheim / DE | 06 /
Anspaugh, Douglas D. 4007 Winecott Drive Apex NC 27502 / US | 07 /
Culbertson, Deborah L. 6400 Vintage Ridge Lane Fuquay Varina NC 27526 / US | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | BASF IP Association BASF SE ZRX-C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11758896.2 | 21.03.2011 | [2016/49] | WO2011IB51176 | Priority number, date | US20100316482P | 23.03.2010 Original published format: US 316482 P | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011117804 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2550265 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2550265 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, A01N43/58 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
A01N43/58 (EP,US);
A61P33/00 (EP);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/05] | C07D403/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, A01N43/58, A01N43/80 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRIDAZINVERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON WIRBELLOSEN SCHÄDLINGEN | [2013/05] | English: | PYRIDAZINE COMPOUNDS FOR CONTROLLING INVERTEBRATE PESTS | [2013/05] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE PYRIDAZINE DESTINÉS À LUTTER CONTRE LES ORGANISMES NUISIBLES INVERTÉBRÉS | [2013/05] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 13.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2011 | AL | 07.12.2016 | AT | 07.12.2016 | BE | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | CZ | 07.12.2016 | DK | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | FI | 07.12.2016 | HR | 07.12.2016 | IT | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | MK | 07.12.2016 | NL | 07.12.2016 | PL | 07.12.2016 | RO | 07.12.2016 | RS | 07.12.2016 | SE | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | SM | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | BG | 07.03.2017 | NO | 07.03.2017 | GR | 08.03.2017 | GB | 21.03.2017 | IE | 21.03.2017 | LU | 21.03.2017 | MT | 21.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | PT | 07.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.03.2011 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
TR | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 21.03.2011 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.03.2011 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.03.2011 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 07.12.2016 | |
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 07.12.2016 | |
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IP]EP2236505 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [IP] 1-21 * Formula (I); paragraph [0028]; example -; claim - *; | [I]WO2006000333 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-21 * Formula (I); page 31, line 22 - line 27; examples Ia-50, Ia-51; claim - *; | [A]EP0199281 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-21 * Formula (I);;; example -; claim - *; | [AD]WO2009106203 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-21 * Formula (I);;; example 34; claim - * | International search | [A]WO2009027393 (BASF SE [DE], et al); | [A]JP2009078991 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [A]WO2007068375 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al); | [AP]WO2011003793 (BASF SE [DE], et al); | [AP]WO2011003796 (BASF SE [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO2007068373 | WO2007068375 | WO2007068377 | WO2005074686 | WO2005075411 | WO03106427 | WO0153259 | WO0149664 | WO2005075452 | DE19649093 | DE3933573 | JP2009078991 | WO2009106203 | US6222100 | WO0182685 | WO0026390 | WO9741218 | WO9802526 | WO9802527 | WO2004106529 | WO2005020673 | WO03014357 | WO03013225 | WO03014356 | WO2004016073 | WO9200377 | EP0242236 | EP0242246 | US5559024 | WO0215701 | EP0374753 | WO9307278 | WO9534656 | EP0427529 | EP0451878 | WO03018810 | WO03052073 | EP0392225 | US3060084 | EP0707445 | WO9113546 | US4172714 | US4144050 | US3920442 | US5180587 | US5232701 | US5208030 | GB2095558 | US3299566 | WO03086075 | US4822779 | US6300348 | WO2007101540 | WO2005085216 | WO2007079162 | WO2007026965 | WO2009126668 | WO2009051956 | WO2008072743 | WO2008072783 | WO2007043677 | WO02089579 | WO02090320 | WO02090321 | WO2004006677 | WO2005068423 | WO2005068432 | WO2005063694 | WO2007115644 | JP2006131529 | WO2007060839 | WO2008066153 | WO2008108491 | JP2008115155 | - BIOTECHNOL PROG., (200107), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 720 - 8 | - PROTEIN ENG DES SEL., (200401), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 57 - 66 | - NAT. PROTOC., (2007), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 1225 - 35 | - CURR. OPIN. CHEM. BIOL., (20060828), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 487 - 91 | - BIOMATERIALS, (200103), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 405 - 17 | - BIOCONJUG. CHEM., (200501), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 113 - 21 | - HOUBEN-WEYL, Methoden der organ. Chemie, GEORG-THIEME-VERLAG, (1985), vol. E5, pages 941 - 1045 | - J.C. SHEEHAN; G.P. HESS, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1955), vol. 77, page 1067 | - B. BELLEAU; G. MALEK, J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1968), vol. 90, page 1651 | - Y. KISO; H. YAJIMA, J. CHEM. SOC., CHEM. COMMUN., (1972), page 942 | - B. CASTRO; J.R. DOMOY; G. EVIN; C. SELVE, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1975), vol. 14, page 1219 | - J. COSTE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1990), vol. 31, page 205 | - R. KNORR; A. TRZECIAK; W. BANNWARTH; D. GIL-LESSEN, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1989), vol. 30, page 1927 | - S. CHEN; J. XU, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1992), vol. 33, page 647 | - J. DIAGO-MESEQUER, SYNTHESIS, (1980), page 547 | - "Agglomeration", BROWNING, Chemical Engineering, (19671204), pages 147 - 48 | - Perry's Chemical Engineer's Handbook, 4th Ed., MCGRAW-HILL, (1963), pages 8 - 57 | - MOLLET, H.; GRUBEMANN, A., Formulation technology, WILEY VCH VERLAG GMBH, (2001), page 2 | - D. A. KNOWLES, Chemistry and Technology of Agrochemical Formulations, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1998), ISBN 0-7514-0443-8 | - Farm Chemicals Handbook, MEISTER PUBLISHING COMPANY, (2001), vol. 88 | - PESTICIDE SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 54, pages 237 - 243 |