EP2554880 - MECHANICAL SEALING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUEFUJI, Yoshihiro c/o Eagle Industry Co. Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11759276.6 | 16.03.2011 | WO2011JP56194 | Priority number, date | JP20100072663 | 26.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010072663 | [2013/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011118470 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2554880 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/34 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
F16J15/3488 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | MECHANISCHE ABDICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/06] | English: | MECHANICAL SEALING DEVICE | [2013/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ MÉCANIQUE | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2012 | Translation filed | 15.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 12.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 24.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5716054 (DUFFEE HENRY S [US], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]US5961122 (MARSI JOSEPH A [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US6068263 (AZIBERT HENRI V [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2004201176 (BJORNSON CARL C [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS60182569U (EAGLE KOGYO CO., LTD.); | [A]JP2001141074 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING); | [A]JP2005127436 (TANKEN SEAL SEIKO CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH0771617 | JP2003166651 | JP2006291988 | WO2007113645 | JP2007298123 | WO2007136453 |