EP2553928 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR PROVIDING AN ENCODED DIGITAL SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agency for Science, Technology and Research 1 Fusionopolis Way 20-10 Connexis Singapore 138632 / SG | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Rongshan PKM Institute for Infocomm Research 1 Fusionopolis Way 21-01 Connexis South Tower Singapore 138632 / SG | 02 /
LI, Te PKM Institute for Infocomm Research 1 FusionopolisWay 21-01 Connexis South Tower Singapore 138632 / SG | 03 /
SHU, Haiyan PKM Institute for Infocomm Research 1 Fusionopolis Way 21-01 Connexis South Tower Singapore 138632 / SG | 04 /
RAHARDJA, Susanto PKM Institute for Infocomm Research 1 Fusionopolis Way 21-01 Connexis South Tower Singapore 138632 / SG | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 11759807.8 | 22.03.2011 | WO2011SG00112 | Priority number, date | SG20100002108 | 26.03.2010 Original published format: SG 201002108 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011119111 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2553928 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, G10L19/00 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
G10L19/00 (US);
H04N19/132 (EP,US);
H04N19/149 (EP,US);
H04N19/152 (EP,US);
H04N19/154 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES KODIERTEN DIGITALSIGNALS | [2013/06] | English: | METHODS AND DEVICES FOR PROVIDING AN ENCODED DIGITAL SIGNAL | [2013/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR UN SIGNAL NUMÉRIQUE CODÉ | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 24.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/12] | 31.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - TE LI ET AL, "Fixed Quality Layered Audio Based on Scalable Lossless Coding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MULTIMEDIA, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20090401), vol. 11, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TMM.2009.2012917, ISSN 1520-9210, pages 422 - 432, XP011346590 [X] 1-12 * page 423, paragraph IIA; figures 1,2 * * page 426, column 2, paragraph IIIC * * page 427, column 2, paragraph IIID - page 428, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMM.2009.2012917 | [X] - RONGSHAN YU ET AL, "Perceptually Enhanced Bit-Plane Coding for Scalable Audio", 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO (ICME 2006), TORONTO, ONT., CANADA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20060701), ISBN 978-1-4244-0366-0, pages 1153 - 1156, XP031033045 [X] 1-12 * page 1153, paragraph 1 - page 1154, paragraph 3.1 * | [X] - CHUNG-MING HUANG ET AL, "A Multilayered Audiovisual Streaming System Using the Network Bandwidth Adaptation and the Two-Phase Synchronization", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MULTIMEDIA, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20090801), vol. 11, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TMM.2009.2021719, ISSN 1520-9210, pages 797 - 809, XP011346619 [X] 1 * page 799, paragraph III - page 801, paragraph IV; figures 1-3; tables 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMM.2009.2021719 | [X] - TE LI ET AL, "On Integer MDCT for Perceptual Audio Coding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AUDIO, SPEECH AND LANGUAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (20071101), vol. 15, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TASL.2007.905144, ISSN 1558-7916, pages 2236 - 2248, XP011192977 [X] 1-11 * page 2237, column 1, paragraph II - column 2 * * page 2245, column 1, paragraph IV.B.3) - page 2246, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TASL.2007.905144 | International search | [Y]US2002010938 (ZHANG QIAN [CN], et al); | [A]US2004049379 (THUMPUDI NAVEEN [US], et al); | [X] - HUANG, C-M ET AL., "A multilayered Audiovisual Streaming System Using the Network Bandwidth Adaptation and the Two Phase Synchronization", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MULTIMEDIA, (200908), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 799 - 801, XP011346619 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMM.2009.2021719 |