Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008033516 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2008 | A3 | WO2008033516 | 22.05.2008 | A9 | WO2008033516 | 20.03.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90083107 | 13.09.2007 | US84457606 | 14.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8585322 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2013 | B2 | US2010272516 | 28.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66164410 | 22.03.2010 | US90083107 | 13.09.2007 | US84457606 | 14.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8403597 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2013 | B2 | US2010266342 | 21.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | US90083107 | 13.09.2007 | US84457606 | 14.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7682105 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2010 | B2 | US2008069642 | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90083107 | 13.09.2007 | US84457606 | 14.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2064007 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2016 | B1 | EP2064007 | 13.06.2012 | A4 | EP2064007 | 03.06.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90083107 | 13.09.2007 | US84457606 | 14.09.2006 | WO2007US20024 | 14.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103097044B | Global Dossier | 10.08.2016 | B | CN103097044 | 08.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | WO2011US00506 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2794203 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2017 | C | CA2794203 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | WO2011US00506 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011229963B | Global Dossier | 25.02.2016 | B2 | AU2011229963 | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | WO2011US00506 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2550117 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2016 | B1 | EP2550117 | 17.07.2013 | A4 | EP2550117 | 30.01.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | WO2011US00506 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012025120 | 22.03.2016 | B1 | BR112012025120 | 31.03.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | WO2011US00506 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2663170 | 19.11.2013 | C | CA2663170 | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90083107 | 13.09.2007 | US84457606 | 14.09.2006 | WO2007US20024 | 14.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2572743T | 02.06.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | WO2011US00506 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2581986T | 08.09.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US90083107 | 13.09.2007 | US84457606 | 14.09.2006 | WO2007US20024 | 14.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012010934 | 07.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | WO2011US00506 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2064007T | 15.07.2016 | T | Priority number | Date | US90083107 | 13.09.2007 | US84457606 | 14.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2536451 | 27.12.2014 | C2 | RU2012144611 | 27.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | WO2011US00506 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG184144 | 30.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | WO2011US00506 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011119205 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2012 | A3 | WO2011119205 | 29.09.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US66164410 | 22.03.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011119204 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2012 | A3 | WO2011119204 | 29.09.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2012002631 | 30.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY180151 | 23.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20130783 | 20.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20180111 | 18.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66164310 | 22.03.2010 |