EP2552635 - CHROMATOGRAPHY APPARATUS HAVING DIFFUSION-BONDED AND SURFACE-MODIFIED COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waters Technologies Corporation 34 Maple Street Milford, MA 01757 / US | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUNNER, Bernard 131 Magazine Street 5 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
DOURDEVILLE, Theodore, A. 29 Bell Guzzle Lane Marion, MA 02738 / US | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Corinna Vossius IP Group Intellectual Property Law Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Widenmayerstrasse 43 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/06] | Schollweck, Susanne, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Partnerschaft Geibelstraße 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11760285.4 | 25.03.2011 | WO2011US29934 | Priority number, date | US20100317767P | 26.03.2010 Original published format: US 317767 P | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011119922 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2552635 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/00, B23K37/00 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
G01N30/7266 (EP,US);
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
B01L3/502753 (EP,US);
B23B35/00 (US);
B23H9/12 (US);
B23H9/14 (US);
B23K20/023 (EP,US);
B23K20/233 (EP,US);
B23K26/382 (US);
C23C16/44 (US);
C23C26/00 (US);
C23F1/14 (US);
G01N30/6095 (EP,US);
H01J49/0018 (EP,US);
H01J49/167 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0689 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | CHROMATOGRAPHIEVORRICHTUNG MIT DIFFUSIONSGEBUNDENEN UND OBERFLÄCHENMODIFIZIERTEN KOMPONENTEN | [2013/06] | English: | CHROMATOGRAPHY APPARATUS HAVING DIFFUSION-BONDED AND SURFACE-MODIFIED COMPONENTS | [2013/06] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE POSSÉDANT DES COMPOSANTS LIÉS PAR DIFFUSION ET À SURFACE MODIFIÉE | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 27.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5792943 (CRAIG STEPHEN R [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 6, line 6 - line 32; figure - * * column 13, line 42 - line 54 *; | [Y]US2004238052 (KARP CHRISTOPH D [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0145] *; | [Y]WO2008106613 (WATERS INVESTMENTS LTD [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,9,11-13 * page 29, paragraphs 1-4 * | International search | [Y]WO2008106613 (WATERS INVESTMENTS LTD [US], et al); | [Y]US2009282978 (JENSEN KLAVS F [US], et al); | [Y]US4890784 (BAMPTON CLIFFORD C [US]); | [Y]US2009057375 (CROCKETT MARK [US], et al); | [Y]US2004238052 (KARP CHRISTOPH D [US], et al); | [Y]US2006171654 (HAWKINS AARON R [US], et al) | by applicant | US5792943 |