EP2625552 - ARRANGEMENT FOR OPERATING A HAND-HELD GEOPHYSICAL POSITIONING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Okm GmbH Am Fünfminutenweg 6 04603 Windischleuba / DE | [2013/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUSS, Andreas Am Waldschlößchen 5 04617 Fockendorf / DE | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Kruspig, Volkmar, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 15 07545 Gera / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 15 07545 Gera / DE | ||
Former [2013/33] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 15 07545 Gera / DE | Application number, filing date | 11760726.7 | 30.08.2011 | [2015/35] | WO2011EP64859 | Priority number, date | DE20102014054U | 07.10.2010 Original published format: DE 202010014054 U | [2013/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012045527 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2625552 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2625552 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/16 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
G01V3/15 (EP,US);
A45B3/00 (US);
G01V3/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINES HANDGEFÜHRTEN GEOPHYSIKALISCHEN ORTUNGSGERÄTES | [2013/33] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR OPERATING A HAND-HELD GEOPHYSICAL POSITIONING DEVICE | [2013/33] | French: | AGENCEMENT POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN APPAREIL DE LOCALISATION GÉOPHYSIQUE GUIDÉ À LA MAIN | [2013/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 05.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2011 | AL | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | HR | 26.08.2015 | IT | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | MK | 26.08.2015 | MT | 26.08.2015 | NL | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | RS | 26.08.2015 | SE | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | SM | 26.08.2015 | IE | 30.08.2015 | LU | 30.08.2015 | BE | 31.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | FR | 26.10.2015 | GB | 26.11.2015 | NO | 26.11.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.08.2011 | |
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 30.08.2015 | ||
LU | 30.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 26.10.2015 | ||
GB | 26.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 30.08.2011 | |
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 30.08.2015 | ||
LU | 30.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 26.10.2015 | ||
GB | 26.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 30.08.2011 | |
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 30.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 26.10.2015 | ||
GB | 26.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 30.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 26.10.2015 | ||
GB | 26.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 30.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 26.10.2015 | ||
GB | 26.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 30.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
GB | 26.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 30.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 26.08.2015 | |
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3828242 (VANN R) [A] 1-8 * abstract ** column 1, line 25 - column 45 *; | [Y]US4068164 (SCHWARTZ MALCOLM M, et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 1,7,10,11 * * column 2, line 14 - line 50 *; | [A]US4719426 (WEISS OSCAR [GB]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 3,4 * * column 2, line 56 - line 65 *; | [Y]US6954072 (SCHLAPP HUBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * figure 11b * * paragraph [0095] * | by applicant | DE102005011264 | DE102005057154 |