EP2745306 - PLASMA PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P2i Ltd 127 (9-12 North) Milton Park Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 4SA / GB | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KING, Charles Edmund c/o P2i Ltd 127 (9-12 North) Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4SA / GB | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Glansdorp, Freija Gwendolyn Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [2014/26] | Application number, filing date | 11761395.0 | 16.08.2011 | WO2011GB51548 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013024235 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2745306 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, C23C16/509 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
H01J37/32082 (EP);
H01J37/32165 (EP);
H01J37/32376 (EP);
H01J2237/3323 (EP);
H01J2237/3325 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Title | German: | PLASMAVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/26] | English: | PLASMA PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2014/26] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT AU PLASMA | [2014/26] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 07.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]JP2003024772 (CANON KK) [X] 1-4,7-10,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0034] - [0038] - [0052] , [0078] - [0083] - [0092] - [0095] * [A] 14[I] 5,6,11,13; | [XI]EP1564794 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-10,12,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0023] - [0028] - [0042] - [0065] * [I] 6,11,13; | [XAI]US2010245214 (BAEK JONGHOON [US]) [X] 1-5,7-10,12 * abstract * * the whole document * [A] 14 [I] 6,11,13 |