EP2554920 - INDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai No.6 Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Jianghong Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Hui Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Shaolin Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 04 /
WU, Huanlong Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 05 /
LI, Liang Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 06 /
HUANG, Zhen Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 07 /
YANG, Jianqun Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 08 /
JI, Wenwei Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 09 /
MENG, Zhi Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 10 /
LI, Jian Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 11 /
CAO, Liu No. 6 Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2013/20] |
Former [2013/06] | 01 /
ZHU, Jianghong Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Hui Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | |||
03 /
CHEN, Shaolin Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | |||
04 /
WU, Huanlong Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | |||
05 /
LI, Liang Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | |||
06 /
HUANG, Zhen Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | |||
07 /
YANG, Jianqun Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | |||
08 /
JI, Wenwei Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | |||
09 /
MENG, Zhi Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | |||
10 /
LI, Jian Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | |||
11 /
CAO, Liu Qianshan Jinji West Road Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Alexander Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/11] | Schmitz, Alexander Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/06] | Schmitz, Alexander Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11761979.1 | 25.03.2011 | [2020/11] | WO2011CN72177 | Priority number, date | CN201010142896 | 02.04.2010 Original published format: CN201010142896 | [2013/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011120405 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2554920 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2554920 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/20, F24F1/00 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
F24F13/20 (EP,KR,US);
F24F1/0057 (EP,US);
F24F1/0043 (KR);
F24F2221/26 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/06] | F24F13/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INNENRAUMEINHEIT EINER KLIMAANLAGE | [2013/06] | English: | INDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER | [2013/06] | French: | UNITÉ INTÉRIEURE DE CLIMATISEUR | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2012 | Translation filed | 30.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 14.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2019 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2011 | AL | 11.03.2020 | AT | 11.03.2020 | CY | 11.03.2020 | CZ | 11.03.2020 | DK | 11.03.2020 | EE | 11.03.2020 | FI | 11.03.2020 | HR | 11.03.2020 | LT | 11.03.2020 | LV | 11.03.2020 | MC | 11.03.2020 | MK | 11.03.2020 | MT | 11.03.2020 | NL | 11.03.2020 | PL | 11.03.2020 | RO | 11.03.2020 | RS | 11.03.2020 | SE | 11.03.2020 | SI | 11.03.2020 | SK | 11.03.2020 | SM | 11.03.2020 | TR | 11.03.2020 | IE | 25.03.2020 | LU | 25.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | FR | 11.05.2020 | BG | 11.06.2020 | NO | 11.06.2020 | GR | 12.06.2020 | IS | 11.07.2020 | PT | 05.08.2020 | DE | 01.10.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AL | 11.03.2020 | ||
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 25.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 11.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
DE | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 25.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 11.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
DE | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 25.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 11.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
DE | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 25.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 11.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
DE | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 25.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
DE | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 25.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
DE | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
LU | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
NO | 11.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1248048 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0031] - [0047]; figures 1,2 *[I] 2-22; | [XI]WO2007012156 (SPRINGER CARRIER LTDA [BR], et al) [X] 1,3 * page 4, line 10 - page 8, line 5; figures 1-5 * [I] 2,4-22; | [XI]JP2009115390 (SHARP KK) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-22 | International search | [Y]CN1403748 (TOSHIBA CARRIER CORP [JP]); | [A]CN1451915 (HITACHI HOUSEHOLD ELECTRIC [JP]); | [A]JP2006046705 (HITACHI HOME & LIFE SOLUTIONS); | [X]CN200982711Y (CHANGZHOU XIANGYU AIR CONDITIO [CN]); | [XP]CN201666649U (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES CO); | [XP]CN201666627U (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES CO); | [XP]CN201666650U (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES CO); | [XP]CN201666645U (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES CO); | [XP]CN201666646U (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES CO) |