EP2557210 - POLYESTER FABRIC AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolon Industries, Inc. (Byeoryang-dong) 11, Kolon-ro Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 13837 / KR | [2016/37] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states KOLON INDUSTRIES, INC. Kolon Tower 1-23 Bulyang-dong Kwacheon City, Kyunggi-do 427-709 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jae-Hyung 107-905 Boseong 2 Cha Apt. Sagok-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 730-796 / KR | 02 /
KWAK, Dong-Jin 101-301 Chorong Villa 259 Uksu-dong Suseong-gu Daegu 706-180 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Ki-Jeong B-303 Dongsin Apt. Wansan-dong Yeongcheon-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 770-090 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Hee-Jun 201-803, Bosung Su-Han Apt. DongCheon-Dong, Buk-gu Daegu 702-758 / KR | 05 /
YOUN, Jung-Hoon 406 Daewon Garden 2 Cha Otae-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 730-140 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Sang-Mok 105-1706 Park Mansion Doryang-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 730-020 / KR | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/07] | 01 /
KIM, Jae-Hyung 107-905 Boseong 2 Cha Apt. Sagok-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 730-796 / KR | ||
02 /
KWAK, Dong-Jin 101-301 Chorong Villa 259 Uksu-dong Suseong-gu Daegu 706-180 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Ki-Jeong B-303 Dongsin Apt. Wansan-dong Yeongcheon-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 770-090 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Hee-Jun 5-1 Sinam Apt. 73 Sinam 3-dong Dong-gu Daegu 701-764 / KR | |||
05 /
YOUN, Jung-Hoon 406 Daewon Garden 2 Cha Otae-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 730-140 / KR | |||
06 /
LEE, Sang-Mok 105-1706 Park Mansion Doryang-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 730-020 / KR | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2016/41] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/07] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11762972.5 | 25.03.2011 | [2016/41] | WO2011KR02084 | Priority number, date | KR20100061470 | 28.06.2010 Original published format: KR 20100061470 | KR20100028701 | 30.03.2010 Original published format: KR 20100028701 | [2013/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011122800 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2557210 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2557210 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D03D1/02, D03D15/00, D06M15/564, D06C3/00, B60R21/16, B60R21/235, D06N3/00, D06N3/10, D06N3/14, D06N3/12 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
B60R21/235 (EP,US);
D03D1/00 (US);
D03D1/02 (EP,US);
D06N3/0006 (EP,US);
D06N3/0036 (EP,US);
D06N3/10 (EP,US);
D06N3/128 (EP,US);
D06N3/14 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23509 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/39] | D03D1/02, D03D15/00, D06M15/564, D06C3/00, B60R21/16, B60R21/235, D03D1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/07] | D03D1/02, D03D15/00, D06M15/564, D06C3/00, B60R21/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYESTERGEWEBE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2016/20] | English: | POLYESTER FABRIC AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2013/07] | French: | TISSU POLYESTER ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2013/07] |
Former [2013/07] | POLYESTERFASER UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2012 | Translation filed | 30.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 21.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2011 | AL | 12.10.2016 | AT | 12.10.2016 | BE | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | HR | 12.10.2016 | IT | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | MK | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | RS | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | SM | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | NO | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | GB | 25.03.2017 | IE | 25.03.2017 | LU | 25.03.2017 | MT | 25.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | FR | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
TR | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
GB | 25.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
GB | 25.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
GB | 25.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
GB | 25.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
GB | 25.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
GB | 25.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4401003 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,12-15 * column 2, line 37 - column 7, line 37 * * claims 1-31 *; | [A]US2006252322 (DEBENEDICTIS MACH A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0044] *; | [A]US2007184733 (MANLEY SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0080] *; | [A]EP2042628 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 2 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0041] *; | [X]WO2010027228 (KOLON INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9-11,14,15 * tables 1, 2 * * claims 15, 16 *; | [XP]WO2010123298 (KOLON INC [KR], et al) [XP] 1-15 * claims 1-14; tables 1, 2 *; | EP2423360 [ ] (KOLON INC [KR]) [ ] * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0090]; claims 1-14; tables 1, 2 * | International search | [A]JPH0624284 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]KR950011677 (KOLON INDUSTRIES, INC.); | [A]KR100546462B (KOLON INDUSTRIES, INC.); | [A]KR20090030727 (KOLON INC [KR]) | by applicant | JPH04214437 |