EP2552336 - RECANALIZING OCCLUDED VESSELS USING RADIOFREQUENCY ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RetroVascular, Inc. 5976 West Las Positas Blvd. Suite 120 Pleasanton CA 94588 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | For all designated states RetroVascular, inc. 5976 West Las Positas Blvd. Suite 120 Pleasanton CA 94588 / US | ||
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Retrovascular, Inc. 5976 West Las Positas Blvd. Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATOH, Osamu A2201, 401 Hoshigaokayamate Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi 464-0808 / JP | 02 /
OGATA, Wayne 1121 Stoney Creek Dr. San Ramon CA 94582 / US | [2015/52] |
Former [2013/06] | 01 /
KATOH, Osamu 2-36-2 A-5 Kiyozumi-cho Chikusa-ku Nagano 464-0034 / JP | ||
02 /
OGATA, Wayne 5976 West Las Positas Blvd. Pleasanton California 94588 / US | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2013/06] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11763547.4 | 01.04.2011 | [2016/06] | WO2011US31018 | Priority number, date | US20100753844 | 02.04.2010 Original published format: US 753844 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011123834 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2552336 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2552336 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/18 (KR,US);
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
A61B18/20 (KR);
A61B18/245 (US);
A61B5/0059 (KR,US);
A61B8/12 (US);
A61B90/37 (US);
A61M13/003 (KR,US);
A61M25/09 (KR);
A61M25/10 (KR);
A61M5/00 (KR,US);
A61N7/022 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/24 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00029 (US);
A61B2018/00285 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00291 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/0041 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00839 (US);
A61B2018/00982 (US);
A61B2018/1861 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUKANALISIERUNG VERSTOPFTER GEFÄSSE MITHILFE VON FUNKFREQUENZENERGIE | [2013/06] | English: | RECANALIZING OCCLUDED VESSELS USING RADIOFREQUENCY ENERGY | [2013/06] | French: | RECANALISATION DE VAISSEAUX OCCLUS À L'AIDE D'UNE ÉNERGIE RADIOFRÉQUENCE | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 26.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16154708.8 / EP3045137 | EP18156580.5 / EP3354221 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2011 | AL | 10.02.2016 | AT | 10.02.2016 | CY | 10.02.2016 | CZ | 10.02.2016 | DK | 10.02.2016 | EE | 10.02.2016 | ES | 10.02.2016 | FI | 10.02.2016 | HR | 10.02.2016 | IT | 10.02.2016 | LT | 10.02.2016 | LV | 10.02.2016 | MC | 10.02.2016 | MK | 10.02.2016 | PL | 10.02.2016 | RO | 10.02.2016 | RS | 10.02.2016 | SE | 10.02.2016 | SI | 10.02.2016 | SK | 10.02.2016 | SM | 10.02.2016 | TR | 10.02.2016 | LU | 01.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | BG | 10.05.2016 | NO | 10.05.2016 | GR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 10.06.2016 | PT | 13.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.04.2011 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
TR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 01.04.2011 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
TR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.04.2011 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.04.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO9713471 (TRANSVASCULAR INC [US]) [X] 1,8,10,12,13 * page 10, line 19 - page 11, line 9; figure 8 * [A] 2-7,9 [I] 11; | [A]WO2009042614 (RETRO VASCULAR INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document * | International search | [X]US2004230219 (ROUCHER LEO R [US]); | [Y]US2005171478 (SELMON MATTHEW R [US], et al); | [Y]US2006079880 (SAGE SHAHN S [US], et al); | [Y]US2007208368 (KATOH OSAMU [JP], et al); | [Y]US2008039935 (BUCH WALLY [US], et al); | [Y]WO2009042614 (RETRO VASCULAR INC [US], et al) |