EP2553561 - INTERACTING WITH REMOTE APPLICATIONS DISPLAYED WITHIN A VIRTUAL DESKTOP OF A TABLET COMPUTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citrix Systems Inc. 851 West Cypress Creek Road Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PINTO, Gus 851 West Cypress Creek Road Fort Lauderdale FL 33309 / US | 02 /
KORETSKY, David 851 West Cypress Creek Road Fort Lauderdale FL 33309 / US | 03 /
MARANO, Adam 851 West Cypress Creek Road Fort Lauderdale FL 33309 / US | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Cooper, John Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11763550.8 | 01.04.2011 | WO2011US31025 | Priority number, date | US20100320249P | 01.04.2010 Original published format: US 320249 P | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011123840 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2553561 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, H04L29/08 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
G06F9/452 (EP,US);
H04L67/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/06] | G06F3/14, G06F15/16, G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | INTERAKTION MIT ENTFERNTEN, AUF EINEM VIRTUELLEN DESKTOP EINER TABLET-COMPUTERVORRICHTUNG ANGEZEIGTEN ANWENDUNGEN | [2013/06] | English: | INTERACTING WITH REMOTE APPLICATIONS DISPLAYED WITHIN A VIRTUAL DESKTOP OF A TABLET COMPUTING DEVICE | [2013/06] | French: | INTERACTION AVEC DES APPLICATIONS DISTANTES AFFICHÉES SUR UN BUREAU VIRTUEL D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TABLETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 15.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.06.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 17.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009143294 (CITRIX SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0111]; figure 12b * * paragraph [0157] * * paragraph [0204] - paragraph [0249] * * paragraph [0252] - paragraph [0273] * * paragraph [0275] - paragraph [0288] *; | [A]US2002084991 (HARRISON EDWARD R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0022] *; | [A]US2007043550 (TZRUYA YOAV M [IL]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0062] * | International search | [A]US2007056009 (SPILO MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2009100129 (VIGIL JOSE MANUEL [AR], et al); | [A]US2008248834 (CHATTERJEE MANJIRNATH [US], et al); | [A]US2005231517 (TULI RAJA [CA]) | by applicant | WO2009143294 | US2002084991 | US2007043550 |