EP2617257 - PHYSICAL LAYER HEADER WITH ACCESS POINT IDENTIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENTINK, Maarten Menzo 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2014/33] |
Former [2013/30] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11764029.2 | 14.09.2011 | WO2011US51641 | Priority number, date | US201113231726 | 13.09.2011 Original published format: US201113231726 | US20100388852P | 01.10.2010 Original published format: US 388852 P | US20100383252P | 15.09.2010 Original published format: US 383252 P | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012037284 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2617257 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2617257 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, // H04W74/04 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
H04W74/0816 (EP,CN,US);
H04W74/08 (KR);
H04B7/0697 (US);
H04W48/14 (KR);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W74/04 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/30] | H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHYSICAL-LAYER-HEADER MIT ZUGANGSPUNKTIDENTIFIKATOR | [2013/30] | English: | PHYSICAL LAYER HEADER WITH ACCESS POINT IDENTIFIER | [2013/30] | French: | EN-TÊTE DE COUCHE PHYSIQUE AVEC IDENTIFIANT DE POINT D'ACCÈS | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 28.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13190606.7 / EP2693827 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2011 | AL | 13.08.2014 | AT | 13.08.2014 | BE | 13.08.2014 | CY | 13.08.2014 | CZ | 13.08.2014 | DK | 13.08.2014 | EE | 13.08.2014 | ES | 13.08.2014 | FI | 13.08.2014 | HR | 13.08.2014 | IT | 13.08.2014 | LT | 13.08.2014 | LV | 13.08.2014 | MC | 13.08.2014 | MK | 13.08.2014 | MT | 13.08.2014 | NL | 13.08.2014 | PL | 13.08.2014 | RO | 13.08.2014 | RS | 13.08.2014 | SE | 13.08.2014 | SI | 13.08.2014 | SK | 13.08.2014 | SM | 13.08.2014 | TR | 13.08.2014 | IE | 14.09.2014 | LU | 14.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | FR | 13.10.2014 | BG | 13.11.2014 | NO | 13.11.2014 | GR | 14.11.2014 | IS | 13.12.2014 | PT | 15.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.09.2011 | |
AT | 13.08.2014 | ||
BE | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MK | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
TR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.09.2014 | ||
LU | 14.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 13.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 14.09.2011 | |
AT | 13.08.2014 | ||
BE | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
TR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.09.2014 | ||
LU | 14.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 13.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 14.09.2011 | |
AT | 13.08.2014 | ||
BE | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.09.2014 | ||
LU | 14.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 13.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.09.2011 | |
AT | 13.08.2014 | ||
BE | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 13.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 13.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 13.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 13.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 13.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 13.08.2014 | |
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 13.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010135319 (WANG CHARLES CHUNAMING [CN], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * figures 2,3 *; | [A] - SIWARUK SIWAMOGSATHAM ED - ANONYMOUS, "A novel smart-DCF scheme for high-speed WLANs", COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, 2007. ISCIT '07. INT ERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PI, (20071001), doi:10.1109/ISCIT.2007.4392168, ISBN 978-1-4244-0976-1, pages 1032 - 1037, XP031166613 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * chapter III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCIT.2007.4392168 | [A] - SIWAMOGSATHAM S ED - ANONYMOUS, "On Backoff Timer Scheduling for Smart-DCF and Performance Evaluation", ADVANCED INFORMATION NETWORKING AND APPLICATIONS - WORKSHOPS, 2008. AINAW 2008. 22ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080325), ISBN 978-0-7695-3096-3, pages 1278 - 1284, XP031240991 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * chapter 2 * |