Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012126511 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012028694 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012028338 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9440767 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2016 | B2 | US2013161325 | 27.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP65143 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | US201113820185 | 01.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101878512B | Global Dossier | 13.07.2018 | B1 | KR20130139250 | 20.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP65143 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5986087B | Global Dossier | 06.09.2016 | B2 | JP2013539441 | 24.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP65143 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2426058 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103167988B | Global Dossier | 20.01.2016 | B | CN103167988 | 19.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP65143 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2809717 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2018 | C | CA2809717 | 08.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP65143 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011298346B | Global Dossier | 19.02.2015 | B2 | AU2011298346 | 11.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP65143 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2611705 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2017 | B1 | EP2611705 | 10.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11764694 | 01.09.2011 | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP65143 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013004761 | 10.09.2019 | B1 | BR112013004761 | 02.08.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP65143 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA024023 | 31.08.2016 | B1 | EA201390321 | 30.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP65143 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2625356T | 19.07.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP65143 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX358488 | 23.08.2018 | B | MX2013002376 | 02.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP65143 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY158987 | 30.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2611705T | 31.08.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP11764694 | 01.09.2011 | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG188348 | 30.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP65143 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA110625 | 25.01.2016 | C2 | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP65143 | 01.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201302246 | 27.11.2013 | B | Priority number | Date | EP10174888 | 01.09.2010 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 | US201161508195 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 |