EP2611705 - RECLOSING CAN FOR FOOD PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.V.D.S. BVBA Oude Brusselseweg 83 9050 Gentbrugge / BE | [2013/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDERSTRAETEN, Erwin Oude Brusselseweg 83 B-9050 Gentbrugge / BE | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | IPLodge bv Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/08] | De Baere, Ivo IPLodge Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | ||
Former [2013/28] | De Baere, Ivo IPLodge bvba Bondgenotenlaan 93 bus 5 3000 Leuven / BE | Application number, filing date | 11764694.3 | 01.09.2011 | [2017/08] | WO2011EP65143 | Priority number, date | US201161508195P | 15.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161508195 P | WO2011EP54248 | 21.03.2011 Original published format: PCT/EP2011/054248 | WO2011EP52078 | 11.02.2011 Original published format: PCT/EP2011/052078 | EP20100174888 | 01.09.2010 Original published format: EP 10174888 | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012028694 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611705 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2611705 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D17/32 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
B65D17/4014 (EP,BR,US);
B65D17/00 (KR);
B65D51/22 (US);
B21D51/2653 (BR,US);
B65B7/16 (US);
B65D2517/0014 (EP,BR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | 22.03.2013 | ME | 22.03.2013 | Title | German: | WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARE DOSE FÜR EIN LEBENSMITTELPRODUKT | [2013/28] | English: | RECLOSING CAN FOR FOOD PRODUCT | [2013/28] | French: | REFERMETURE D'UNE CANETTE CONÇUE POUR DES PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 05.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2011 | AL | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | IT | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | RS | 22.02.2017 | SE | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | MT | 01.09.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 01.09.2011 | |
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
MT | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 01.09.2011 | |
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
MT | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.09.2011 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
MT | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
MT | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.02.2017 | |
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4190174 (HAIMOWITZ IRWIN [US]) [A] 1,30-33 * abstract *; | [A]US4361249 (TUNESKI RICHARD J, et al) [A] 1,30-42* abstract *; | [AD]US5810189 (BAKER ANTHONY LEONARD [GB]) [AD] 1-3,15-18,22-26,30-33 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2007147542 (HEIGL HORST [DE]) [X] 1,30,31 * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 22; figures 4a,4b * | by applicant | US4784283 | US5810189 | US2008314904 | WO2011EP52078 |