EP2619209 - ATROPISOMERS OF PI3K-INHIBITING COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilead Calistoga LLC 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2014/08] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Gilead Calistoga LLC 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City. CA 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVARTS, Jerry, B. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City CA 94404 / US | 02 /
ULRICH, Roger, G. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City CA 94404 / US | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/31] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11764933.5 | 23.09.2011 | WO2011US53102 | Priority number, date | US20100386420P | 24.09.2010 Original published format: US 386420 P | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012040634 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2619209 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/4985, A61P29/00 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | ATROPISOMERE AUS PI3K-HEMMENDEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2013/31] | English: | ATROPISOMERS OF PI3K-INHIBITING COMPOUNDS | [2013/31] | French: | ATROPISOMÈRES DE COMPOSÉS INHIBITEUR DE PI3K | [2013/31] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 18.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2009088986 (INTELLIKINE INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-48 * compounds 1-21,23,25,27,30-33,36,37,39,41-45,48-56,75-77,80,82-85,88,89,95-99,104,106,113,118-121,145,148-152,160,163,165,168,170,173-175,180-182,184-188,190-194; page 2, line 20 - page 2, line 22; claim - *; | [ID]US2003195211 (SADHU CHANCHAL [US], et al) [ID] 1-48 * column 1, paragraph [0003];;; example -; claim - * | by applicant | US6800620 | WO2009088990 | - CHANTRY ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1997), vol. 272, pages 19236 - 19241 | - LEE ET AL., FASEB J., (2006), vol. 2, pages 455 - 465 | - FLINN ET AL., J CLIN. ONCOL., (2009), vol. 27, page 15S | - CHEMISTRY & BIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 12, pages 123 - 34 | - FOSTER, "Deuterium Isotope Effects in Studies of Drug Metabolism", TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (1984), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/0165-6147(84)90534-0, pages 524 - 527, XP025943358 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-6147(84)90534-0 | - OKI, M., "Recent Advances in Atropisomerism", TOPICS IN STEREOCHEMISTRY, (1983), vol. L4, page 1 | - Methods in Cell Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1976), vol. XIV, page 33 | - BERGE ET AL., J PHARM SCI, (1977), vol. 66, page 1 | - CHEMISTRY & BIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 17, pages 123 - 34 | US20100731089 |