EP2553681 - DICTATION CLIENT FEEDBACK TO FACILITATE AUDIO QUALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NVOQ Incorporated 1715 38th Street Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOX, Peter 355 30th Street Boulder, Colorado 80305 / US | 02 /
CLARK, Michael 1271 Hummingbird Circle Apt. C Longmont, Colorado 80501 / US | 03 /
FOLTYNSKI, Jarek 6642 Kalua Road Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2013/47] |
Former [2013/06] | Romedahl, Bengt, et al Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11766375.7 | 21.03.2011 | WO2011US29257 | Priority number, date | US20100319078P | 30.03.2010 Original published format: US 319078 P | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011126716 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2553681 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/02, G10L15/26, G06F15/16 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
G10L25/78 (EP,US);
G06F3/165 (EP,US);
G10L15/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | DIKTIER-CLIENTFEEDBACK ZUR ERHÖHUNG EINER AUDIOQUALITÄT | [2013/06] | English: | DICTATION CLIENT FEEDBACK TO FACILITATE AUDIO QUALITY | [2013/06] | French: | RÉTROACTION DE CLIENT DE DICTÉE FACILITANT LA QUALITÉ AUDIO | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/12] | 31.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR0164200B (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2000250584 (TAKADA YUKIHIKO); | [X]US2002019734 (BARTOSIK HEINRICH FRANZ [AT]); | [A]JP2009169445 (DENSO CORP) |