EP2574215 - HD BARCODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Naddor, D. 10540 Branham Fields Rd Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 / US | [2013/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB, et al Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner, et al Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/14] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11766563.8 | 04.04.2011 | WO2011US31118 | Priority number, date | US20100341835P | 06.04.2010 Original published format: US 341835 P | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011126993 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2574215 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G06K9/18 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
G06K19/06028 (EP,US);
G06K19/06075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Title | German: | HD-STRICHODE | [2013/14] | English: | HD BARCODE | [2013/14] | French: | CODE À BARRES HD | [2013/14] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/14] | 19.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/18] | 02.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/18] | Request for further processing for: | 25.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees MT, EE, AL, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 25.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 25.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 25.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 25.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009326836 (HOVIS GREGORY L [US], et al); | [A]US2009230193 (AL-HUSSEIN HUSSEIN [US], et al); | [A]US2010044445 (KILICCOTE HAN [US]); | [A]US2009307232 (HALL EDWARD [GB]) |