EP2612432 - MODULAR STACKED POWER CONVERTER VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIHLER, Christof, Martin Freisinger Landstr. 50 Garching Bavaria / DE | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11767320.2 | 25.08.2011 | WO2011US49060 | Priority number, date | US20100875175 | 03.09.2010 Original published format: US 875175 | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012030605 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2612432 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/00, H02M7/10, H02B13/00, H05K7/14 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
H02M7/003 (EP,US);
H02M7/106 (EP,US);
H02M7/4835 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Title | German: | MODULARES GESTAPELTES LEISTUNGSWANDLERGEFÄSS | [2013/28] | English: | MODULAR STACKED POWER CONVERTER VESSEL | [2013/28] | French: | CAISSON CONVERTISSEUR D'ÉNERGIE EMPILÉ MODULAIRE | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 07.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/31] | 24.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3723846 (THOMPSON CH) [Y] 7,15 * column 4, line 62 - line 66 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 4 *; | [XY]WO9317488 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE]) [X] 20 * page 8; figures 1,4,5 *[Y] 10,11,18,19; | [XAY]US6265656 (BERTH MATTHIAS [CH]) [X] 1-6,8,9,12-14,16,17 * column 1 - column 4; figures 2,4; claim 1 * [A] 20 [Y] 7,10,11,15,18,19 |