EP2617250 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF IMPROVING CIRCUIT-SWITCHED FALLBACK USER EXPERIENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMACHANDRAN, Shyamal 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
KLINGENBRUNN, Thomas 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11767507.4 | 14.09.2011 | WO2011US51638 | Priority number, date | US201113231788 | 13.09.2011 Original published format: US201113231788 | US20100382711P | 14.09.2010 Original published format: US 382711 P | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012037281 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2617250 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/12, H04W76/02 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
H04W76/18 (EP,US);
H04W68/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/00224 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/1443 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/0066 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER ERFAHRUNG EINES BENUTZERS BEI LEITUNGSVERMITTELTEM FALLBACK | [2013/30] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF IMPROVING CIRCUIT-SWITCHED FALLBACK USER EXPERIENCE | [2013/30] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE L'EXPÉRIENCE UTILISATEUR EN REPLI SUR COMMUTATION DE CIRCUITS | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 25.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/50] | 04.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2009094916 (ZTE CORP [CN], et al); | EP2247039 [ ] (ZTE CORP [CN]); |