EP2622202 - FILTER SYSTEM WITH FUEL-WATER SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, IL 61629 / US | For all designated states Advanced Filtration Systems, INC. 3206 Farber Drive Champaign, IL 61822 / US | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIES, Jeffrey, R. 1330 North Independence Court Metamora IL 61548-8996 / US | 02 /
SALVADOR, Christopher, J. 11217 North Oakwood Drive Unit 2 Peoria IL 60615 / US | 03 /
HEIBENTHAL, Randall, W. 604 S. Oak Drive Mahomet IL 61853 / US | 04 /
DEEDRICH, Dennis, M. 2300 Valleybrook Champaign IL 61822 / US | 05 /
EISENMENGER, Richard, J. 305 Emerald Lane P.O. Box 318 Philo, IL 61864 / US | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11767582.7 | 30.09.2011 | WO2011US54127 | Priority number, date | US201113230241 | 12.09.2011 Original published format: US201113230241 | US20100389045P | 01.10.2010 Original published format: US 389045 P | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012044884 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2622202 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2622202 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02M37/22, B01D36/00 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
F02M37/28 (EP,US);
B01D29/13 (US);
B01D35/005 (US);
B01D35/16 (EP,US);
B01D35/306 (US);
B01D36/006 (EP,US);
F02M37/32 (EP,US);
B01D2201/295 (EP,US);
Y10S210/05 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERSYSTEM MIT KRAFTSTOFF-WASSER-ABSCHEIDER | [2013/32] | English: | FILTER SYSTEM WITH FUEL-WATER SEPARATOR | [2013/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FILTRE AVEC SÉPARATEUR COMBUSTIBLE-EAU | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 14.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.08.2014 | CY | 06.08.2014 | EE | 06.08.2014 | HR | 06.08.2014 | LT | 06.08.2014 | LV | 06.08.2014 | MC | 06.08.2014 | MK | 06.08.2014 | MT | 06.08.2014 | PL | 06.08.2014 | RS | 06.08.2014 | SE | 06.08.2014 | SI | 06.08.2014 | SK | 06.08.2014 | SM | 06.08.2014 | IE | 30.09.2014 | LU | 30.09.2014 | PT | 09.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MK | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 30.09.2014 | ||
LU | 30.09.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 30.09.2014 | ||
LU | 30.09.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 30.09.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 30.09.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 30.09.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 30.09.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | LT | 06.08.2014 | |
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 06.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0715873 (BALDWIN FILTERS INC [US]) [A] 1,10* the whole document *; | [A]US5606989 (ROLL MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6139738 (MAXWELL MARTIN C [US]) [A] 1,5,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2009078623 | US20110230241 | US20100389045 |