EP2655803 - MULTI-STAGE OR MULTI-CHANNEL PUMP, COMPRESSOR OR MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMESOEDER, Dieter Wilhelmshofstr. 30 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2013/44] | Application number, filing date | 11767718.7 | 12.10.2011 | [2018/09] | WO2011EP67786 | Priority number, date | DE20101063506 | 20.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010063506 | [2013/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012084290 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2655803 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2655803 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01C21/10, F01C11/00, F01C3/08, F01C1/08 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
F01C3/085 (EP);
F01C1/084 (EP);
F01C11/002 (EP);
F01C21/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] |
Former [2013/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PUMPE, VERDICHTER ODER MOTOR MEHRSTUFIG ODER MEHRFLUTIG | [2013/44] | English: | MULTI-STAGE OR MULTI-CHANNEL PUMP, COMPRESSOR OR MOTOR | [2013/44] | French: | POMPE, COMPRESSEUR OU MOTEUR MULTI-ÉTAGÉ OU MULTIFLUX | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 15.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2011 | AL | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | DK | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | ES | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | HR | 28.02.2018 | IT | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | MK | 28.02.2018 | MT | 28.02.2018 | NL | 28.02.2018 | PL | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | RS | 28.02.2018 | SE | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | SM | 28.02.2018 | TR | 28.02.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | NO | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | AT | 12.10.2018 | GB | 12.10.2018 | IE | 12.10.2018 | LU | 12.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | FR | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MK | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
AT | 12.10.2018 | ||
GB | 12.10.2018 | ||
IE | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
AT | 12.10.2018 | ||
GB | 12.10.2018 | ||
IE | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
AT | 12.10.2018 | ||
GB | 12.10.2018 | ||
IE | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
AT | 12.10.2018 | ||
GB | 12.10.2018 | ||
IE | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
AT | 12.10.2018 | ||
GB | 12.10.2018 | ||
IE | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 12.10.2018 | ||
IE | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 12.10.2018 | ||
IE | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2002037228 (ARNOLD FELIX MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1-4,9,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 5-8,10,11; | [Y]DE102008038625 (COR PUMPS & COMPRESSORS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2582413 (CLARK JAMES M) [Y] 1-7,9-13 * the whole document * * column 2, line 41 - line 49 * | by applicant | DE4241320 |