EP2614435 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN APPLICATION WHICH IS CAPABLE OF BEING EXECUTED ON A DIGITAL TERMINAL WHICH HAS A TOUCH-SENSITIVE SCREEN, AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2013/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENZIG, Walter Domitanstr. 10 68526 Ladenburg / DE | 02 /
HOCHSTÄTTER, Bernhard Waldspirale 2 64289 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
WERNER, Sebastian Goethestr. 63 64285 Darmstadt / DE | [2013/29] | Representative(s) | Schwöbel, Thilo K. Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Schwöbel, Thilo K. Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11767912.6 | 09.09.2011 | WO2011EP04539 | Priority number, date | EP20100009444 | 10.09.2010 Original published format: EP 10009444 | [2013/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012031768 | Date: | 15.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2614435 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F17/30, G06F21/00, G06F3/048 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
G06F8/30 (EP);
G06F9/451 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN EINER AUF EINEM EINEN BERÜHRUNGSEMPFINDLICHEN BILDSCHIRM AUFWEISENDEN DIGITALEN ENDGERÄT LAUFFÄHIGEN ANWENDUNG UND VORRICHTUNG | [2013/29] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN APPLICATION WHICH IS CAPABLE OF BEING EXECUTED ON A DIGITAL TERMINAL WHICH HAS A TOUCH-SENSITIVE SCREEN, AND APPARATUS | [2013/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE APPLICATION POUVANT S'EXÉCUTER SUR UN TERMINAL NUMÉRIQUE POSSÉDANT UN ÉCRAN TACTILE, AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2013/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 04.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2019 | 03.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/19] | 27.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2003181196 (DAVIDOV ERAN [IL], et al) [I] 1-12 * claims 1-10 * * paragraph [0353] - paragraph [0360] *; | [I]WO2006111401 (UBS AG [CH], et al) [I] 1-12 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0022] *; | [XI] - APPLE, "iOS Development Guide. Tools and Languages: IDEs", (20100826), pages 1 - 100, 20100826, URL: http://www.informus.nl/wp-content/uploads/2010/11/iOS-Development-Gui de.pdf, (20110105), XP007916614 [X] 1,2,4,8-12 * page 9 - page 46 * [I] 3,5-7 | [A] - DUTTA S, "Client-side Cross-domain Security", INTERNET CITATION, (20080601), pages 1 - 16, URL: http://msdn.microsoft.com/en-us/library/cc709423(v=vs.85).aspx, (20110104), XP007916604 [A] 7 * the whole document * |