10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
28.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
15.06.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
07.07.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
05.07.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.03.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.02.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
14.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
20.02.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
14.02.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.08.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
01.08.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
01.08.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
06.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.06.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |
18.01.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
18.01.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
04.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|