EP2616646 - DEVICE FOR TREATING SOOT PARTICLE-CONTAINING EXHAUST GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2016/10] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH Hauptstrasse 128 53797 Lohmar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÜCK, Rolf Fröbelstrasse 12 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
HODGSON, Jan Blumenhof 23 53840 Troisdorf / DE | 03 /
VORSMANN, Christian Siegburger Strasse 304 51105 Köln / DE | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2016/28] |
Former [2013/30] | Rössler, Matthias KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11769804.3 | 13.09.2011 | [2016/28] | WO2011EP65886 | Priority number, date | DE20101045508 | 15.09.2010 Original published format: DE102010045508 | [2013/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012035035 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2616646 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2616646 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/01, F01N3/08, F01N13/16, F01N3/023, F01N13/00, B03C3/06, B03C3/12, B03C3/36, B03C3/41, B03C3/49 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
B03C3/06 (EP,US);
B03C3/12 (EP,US);
B03C3/36 (US);
B03C3/363 (EP,US);
B03C3/41 (EP,US);
B03C3/49 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N13/16 (EP,US);
F01N3/01 (EP,KR,US);
F01N3/021 (KR);
F01N3/0231 (EP,US);
B03C2201/06 (EP,US);
B03C2201/10 (EP,US);
B03C2201/30 (EP,US);
F01N2240/04 (EP,US);
F01N2240/20 (EP,US);
F01N2330/32 (EP,US);
F01N2330/38 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/30] | F01N3/01, F01N3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON RUßPARTIKEL ENTHALTENDEM ABGAS | [2013/30] | English: | DEVICE FOR TREATING SOOT PARTICLE-CONTAINING EXHAUST GASES | [2013/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR TRAITER DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT CONTENANT DES PARTICULES DE SUIE | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 26.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2011 | AL | 13.07.2016 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | ES | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | HR | 13.07.2016 | IT | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | MK | 13.07.2016 | MT | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | PL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | RS | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | SM | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | AT | 13.09.2016 | IE | 13.09.2016 | LU | 13.09.2016 | BE | 30.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | GB | 13.10.2016 | NO | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.09.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
MT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
TR | 13.07.2016 | ||
AT | 13.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
LU | 13.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 13.09.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
TR | 13.07.2016 | ||
AT | 13.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
LU | 13.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 13.09.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
AT | 13.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
LU | 13.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
AT | 13.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
LU | 13.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
LU | 13.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3500373 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * page 10, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [A]WO8500406 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph l - page 4, paragraph 1 *; | [A]EP0083845 (CSEPELI AUTOGYAR [HU]) [A] 1 * line 24 - page 19, line 19; figure 3 *; | [A]GB1022714 (CAV LTD) [A] 1 * line 20 - page 2, line 39; figure 1 * | Examination | WO2011029728 | by applicant | WO0180978 | WO0200326 | WO2005099867 | WO2005066469 | WO2006136431 | WO2007140932 |