|
25.10.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.2012 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
04.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
46 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
21 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
52 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
53 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
52 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
51 |