17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
27.10.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
14.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
09.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
18.11.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.11.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
31.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.08.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.08.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
05.08.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
09.05.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
15.04.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.01.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.04.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
17.04.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.02.2015 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.02.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
08.11.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.10.2014 |
First examination report |
|
30.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
03.12.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.08.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
19.07.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
19.07.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
16.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.10.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|