Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9470220 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2016 | B2 | US2014328707 | 06.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | US201113272251 | 13.10.2011 | US201414333202 | 16.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8784079 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2014 | B2 | US2013011284 | 10.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | US201113272251 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9062672 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2015 | B2 | US2012207636 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | US201113272254 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9157430 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2015 | B2 | US2012207635 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | US201113272244 | 13.10.2011 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9062673 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2015 | B2 | US2012163999 | 28.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | US201113272257 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101867802B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2018 | B1 | KR20140114264 | 26.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67917 | 13.10.2011 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101862540B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2018 | B1 | KR20130101541 | 13.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67911 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6040155B | Global Dossier | 07.12.2016 | B2 | JP2013541666 | 14.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67911 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5897017B | Global Dossier | 30.03.2016 | B2 | JP2013539703 | 28.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67917 | 13.10.2011 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2627373 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2018 | B1 | EP2627373 | 21.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67917 | 13.10.2011 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | EP11769878 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2627372 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2020 | B1 | EP2627372 | 21.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67913 | 13.10.2011 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | EP11768024 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2627371 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2016 | B1 | EP2627371 | 21.08.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | EP11768023 | 13.10.2011 | WO2011EP67911 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2441958 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2441485 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2441484 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2441483 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103338796B | Global Dossier | 08.06.2016 | B | CN103338796 | 02.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67913 | 13.10.2011 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103221082B | Global Dossier | 13.01.2016 | B | CN103221082 | 24.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67917 | 13.10.2011 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103221081B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2015 | B | CN103221081 | 24.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67911 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2814588 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2018 | C | CA2814588 | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67913 | 13.10.2011 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2814585 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2018 | C | CA2814585 | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67911 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2814417 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2018 | C | CA2814417 | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67917 | 13.10.2011 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011315484B | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | B2 | AU2011315484 | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67917 | 13.10.2011 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011315482B | Global Dossier | 05.02.2015 | B2 | AU2011315482 | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67913 | 13.10.2011 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011315481B | Global Dossier | 29.01.2015 | B2 | AU2011315481 | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67911 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2627905 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2016 | B1 | EP2627905 | 21.08.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67915 | 13.10.2011 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | EP11769877 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013008879 | 11.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67911 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013008891 | 28.06.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67917 | 13.10.2011 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA025893 | 28.02.2017 | B1 | EA201390528 | 30.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67917 | 13.10.2011 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA026794 | 31.05.2017 | B1 | EA201390529 | 30.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67911 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX362280 | 09.01.2019 | B | MX2013004165 | 05.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67911 | 13.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX363145 | 11.03.2019 | B | MX2013004167 | 05.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | WO2011EP67917 | 13.10.2011 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012049263 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012049262 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2012 | A3 | WO2012049262 | 19.04.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012049261 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012049260 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2012 | A3 | WO2012049260 | 19.04.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP10187380 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187381 | 13.10.2010 | US39249410 | 13.10.2010 | US39249510 | 13.10.2010 | US39249210 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187377 | 13.10.2010 | US39249010 | 13.10.2010 | EP10187378 | 13.10.2010 |