Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9624884 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2017 | B2 | US2013300422 | 14.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010043306 | 03.11.2010 | WO2011EP67784 | 12.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103180588B | Global Dossier | 19.10.2016 | B | CN103180588 | 26.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102010043306 | 03.11.2010 | WO2011EP67784 | 12.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2635783 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010043306 | 03.11.2010 | WO2011EP67784 | 12.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013010695 | 09.08.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102010043306 | 03.11.2010 | WO2011EP67784 | 12.10.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012059305 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010043306 | 03.11.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102010043306 | 07.06.2023 | B4 | DE102010043306 | 03.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010043306 | 03.11.2010 |