EP2595716 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MONITORING PROPERTIES OF AN AQUEOUS STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kemira Oyj Energiakatu 4 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2022/01] |
Former [2013/22] | For all designated states Kemira OYJ Porkkalankatu 3 00180 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOENSUU, Iiris Voudinkuja 3D 16 02780 Espoo / FI | 02 /
PIIRONEN, Marjatta Kannuskuja 1A 1 90540 Oulu / FI | 03 /
SAARI, Eija Nelikkokuja 4A 11 Espoo 02230 / FI | 04 /
SIRVIÖ, Jukka-Pekka Amiraalin Puistotie 6C 50 02320 Espoo / FI | 05 /
TUOMIVAARA, Seppo Ahvenkuja 2 90810 Kiviniemi / FI | [2022/04] |
Former [2013/22] | 01 /
JOENSUU, Iiris Voudinkuja 3D 16 FI-02780 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
PIIRONEN, Marjatta Kannuskuja 1A 1 FI-90540 Oulu / FI | |||
03 /
SAARI, Eija Nelikkokuja 4A 11 FI-Espoo 02230 / FI | |||
04 /
SIRVIÖ, Jukka-Pekka Amiraalin Puistotie 6C 50 FI-02320 Espoo / FI | |||
05 /
TUOMIVAARA, Seppo Ahvenkuja 2 FI-90810 Kiviniemi / FI | Representative(s) | Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 D 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/22] | Hovi, Simo Pekka Tapani Seppo Laine Oy, Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 11770832.1 | 19.07.2011 | [2022/04] | WO2011FI50667 | Priority number, date | FI20100005813 | 20.07.2010 Original published format: FI 20105813 | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012010745 | Date: | 26.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2595716 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2595716 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D21/00, C02F1/52 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
C02F1/5209 (EP,US);
B01D21/01 (EP,US);
B01D21/32 (EP,US);
G01N33/343 (EP,US);
C02F2103/28 (EP,US);
C02F2209/001 (EP,US);
C02F2209/11 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER EIGENSCHAFTEN EINES WÄSSRIGEN STROMS | [2013/22] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MONITORING PROPERTIES OF AN AQUEOUS STREAM | [2013/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR SURVEILLER LES PROPRIÉTÉS D'UN COURANT AQUEUX | [2013/22] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 16.12.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 12.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 16.07.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 08.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.07.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 13.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.04.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2017 | Decision despatched | 12.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.03.2014 | Decision despatched | Loss of rights: Claims | 25.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.06.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2011 | AL | 26.01.2022 | CY | 26.01.2022 | DK | 26.01.2022 | EE | 26.01.2022 | HR | 26.01.2022 | LT | 26.01.2022 | LV | 26.01.2022 | MC | 26.01.2022 | MK | 26.01.2022 | MT | 26.01.2022 | RO | 26.01.2022 | RS | 26.01.2022 | SI | 26.01.2022 | SM | 26.01.2022 | BG | 26.04.2022 | NO | 26.04.2022 | GR | 27.04.2022 | IS | 26.05.2022 | IE | 19.07.2022 | LU | 19.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.07.2011 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
MK | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 19.07.2011 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 19.07.2011 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | DK | 26.01.2022 | |
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | HR | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NO | 26.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]CH516329 (AMMANN U MASCHF AG [CH]); | [XI]GB2050336 (COAL INDUSTRY PATENTS LTD); | [A]US5809825 (HOWARD COLIN JAMES [AU]); | [X]WO0043322 (CIBA SPEC CHEM WATER TREAT LTD [GB], et al) | Examination | WO9417394 | by applicant | US4279759 | US2004182138 | WO2005022278 |