EP2621792 - MOLDED CARRIER FOR MOVING ON AN ASSEMBLY LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA VPIB - LG081 Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZO, Stéphane 4 square des Ormes F-78160 Marly Le Roy / FR | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Rosenberg, Muriel Sylvie, et al PSA Automobiles SA VPIB - LG081 18 rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Rosenberg, Muriel Sylvie, et al Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Propriété Industrielle - LG 081 18 rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 11771247.1 | 21.09.2011 | WO2011FR52178 | Priority number, date | FR20100057804 | 28.09.2010 Original published format: FR 1057804 | [2013/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012045943 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2621792 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2621792 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B62D65/18 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
B25H1/0007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFORMTER TRÄGER ZUR BEWEGUNG AUF EINEM MONTAGEBAND | [2013/32] | English: | MOLDED CARRIER FOR MOVING ON AN ASSEMBLY LINE | [2013/32] | French: | SUPPORT REALISE PAR MOULAGE POUR DES DEPLACEMENTS SUR UNE LIGNE D'ASSEMBLAGE | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 04.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2011 | AL | 04.03.2015 | AT | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | ES | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | HR | 04.03.2015 | IT | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MK | 04.03.2015 | MT | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | RS | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | SM | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | NO | 04.06.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | IE | 21.09.2015 | LU | 21.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.09.2011 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 21.09.2015 | ||
LU | 21.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 21.09.2011 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 21.09.2015 | ||
LU | 21.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 21.09.2015 | ||
LU | 21.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 21.09.2015 | ||
LU | 21.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 04.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3699901 (COOK JAMES M) [X] 1,10 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 50; figures 1-5 *; | [X]GB2313591 (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [X] 1,10 * page 5, line 20 - page 8, line 9; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO2007136480 (SHAN IND LLC [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB2313591 |