EP2621862 - A METHOD FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF TETRAVALENT MANGANESE FEROXYHITE FOR ARSENIC REMOVAL FROM WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Loufakis Chemicals S.A. VI.PE.TH. Sindos 570 22 Sindos, Thessaloniki / GR | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITRAKAS, Manassis 17 Metron str. GR-551 32 Thessaloniki / GR | 02 /
SYMEONIDIS, Konstantinos 12 K. Palama str. Filyro GR-570 10 Thessaloniki / GR | 03 /
TRESINTSI, Sofia 28 Tsimiski str. GR-582 00 Edessa / GR | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Panagiotidou, Effimia 3 Aristotelous Str. 546 24 Thessaloniki / GR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Panagiotidou, Effimia 3 Aristotelous str. 546 24 Thessaloniki / GR | Application number, filing date | 11771273.7 | 26.09.2011 | WO2011GR00042 | Priority number, date | GR20100100541 | 28.09.2010 Original published format: GR 20100100541 | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012042282 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2621862 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2621862 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/28, B01J20/06, B01J20/28, C02F101/20, C02F101/10, C02F1/72, C02F1/62, C01G45/00, B01J20/02 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
B01J20/06 (EP,GR,US);
C02F1/28 (GR);
C02F1/62 (US);
B01J20/0222 (EP,US);
B01J20/0229 (EP,US);
B01J20/28 (GR);
B01J20/28004 (EP,US);
B01J20/28019 (EP,US);
B01J20/28021 (EP,US);
B01J20/28061 (EP,US);
C01G45/006 (US);
C01G49/00 (GR);
C01G49/0072 (EP,US);
C02F1/281 (EP,US);
C01P2002/50 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C02F1/72 (EP,US);
C02F2101/103 (EP,US);
C02F2101/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/32] | C02F1/28, B01J20/06, B01J20/28, C01G49/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON VIERWERTIGEM MANGANFEROXYHIT ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON ARSEN AUS WASSER | [2013/32] | English: | A METHOD FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF TETRAVALENT MANGANESE FEROXYHITE FOR ARSENIC REMOVAL FROM WATER | [2013/32] | French: | MÉTHODE DE SYNTHÈSE DE FEROXYHYTE DE MANGANÈSE TÉTRAVALENT POUR L'EXTRACTION DE L'ARSENIC DE L'EAU | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 17.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.08.2014 | AT | 06.08.2014 | BE | 06.08.2014 | CY | 06.08.2014 | CZ | 06.08.2014 | DK | 06.08.2014 | EE | 06.08.2014 | FI | 06.08.2014 | HR | 06.08.2014 | LT | 06.08.2014 | LV | 06.08.2014 | MC | 06.08.2014 | MK | 06.08.2014 | MT | 06.08.2014 | PL | 06.08.2014 | RO | 06.08.2014 | SE | 06.08.2014 | SI | 06.08.2014 | SK | 06.08.2014 | SM | 06.08.2014 | TR | 06.08.2014 | IE | 26.09.2014 | LU | 26.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | BG | 06.11.2014 | NO | 06.11.2014 | GR | 07.11.2014 | IS | 06.12.2014 | PT | 09.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MK | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
TR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/46] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
TR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 26.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 26.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 06.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003183579 (BANDYOPADHYA SIBDAS [IN], et al) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-17 * * paragraphs [0029] , [0049] , [0050] *; | [A]WO2007047624 (INFRAMAT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-5* claims 1-21 *; | [I]CN101024160 (ECOLOGY ENVIRONMENT RES CT CAS [CN]) [I] 1-5 * claims 1-10 * * page 3, line 3 - page 5, line 4 *; | [A]US2010051555 (CRAFT SR FRANK S [US]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0 11] - [0014]; claims 1-2 *; | [A] - KAZUNORI SATO ET AL, "PREFERENTIAL ADSORPTION OF LEAD IONS ON MN-SUBSTITUTED GOETHITE PARTICLES IN AQUEOUS SOLUTIONS OF COPPER, LEAD AND ZINC", ITE LETTERS ON BATTERIES, NEW TECHNOLOGIES & MEDICINE, ITE-IBA OFFICE, BRUNSWICK, OH, US, (20040101), vol. 5, no. 3, ISSN 1531-2046, pages 250 - 255, XP001511728 [A] 1-5 * abstract * * pages 250-251 * | by applicant | US2010051555 | EP2168677 | - G. ZHANG ET AL., WATER RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 41, page 1921 | - G. ZHANG ET AL., JOUMAL OF HAZARDOUS MATERIALS, (2009), vol. 168, page 820 | - H. ZENG ET AL., WATER RESEARCH, (2008), vol. 42, page 4629 | - S.S. MOHANTY ET AL., CHEMISTRY AND ECOLOGY, (2008), vol. 24, page 23 | - X SUN ET AL., CLAYS AND CLAY MINERALS, (1999), vol. 47, page 474 | - P. LAKSHMIPATHIRAJ ET AL., JOUMAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 304, page 317 |