EP2663297 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR PROTECTION OF CELLS AND TISSUES FROM COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Chicago 5801 South Ellis Avenue Chicago, IL 60637 / US | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRDINA, David, J. 94 N. Stauffer Dr. Naperville, IL 60540 / US | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/43] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/47] | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11771290.1 | 16.09.2011 | [2019/43] | WO2011US51946 | Priority number, date | US20100383592P | 16.09.2010 Original published format: US 383592 P | [2013/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012037466 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2663297 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2663297 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/13, A61P39/06, A61K31/661 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/661 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (US);
A61B6/508 (EP,US);
A61K31/132 (EP,US);
A61K31/145 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K33/04 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K49/0008 (US);
A61P39/06 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/132, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/661, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/04, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUM SCHUTZ VON ZELLEN UND GEWEBE VON COMPUTERTOMOGRAFIESTRAHLUNG | [2013/47] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR PROTECTION OF CELLS AND TISSUES FROM COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY RADIATION | [2013/47] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS UTILISÉES POUR PROTÉGER LES CELLULES ET LES TISSUS DES RAYONNEMENTS ÉMIS LORS D'UNE TOMODENSITOMÉTRIE | [2013/47] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 24.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2013/47] | 07.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 02.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19194979.1 / EP3632419 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Request for further processing for: | 07.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 07.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 07.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 07.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 07.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 07.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2013 | Decision despatched | 07.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 07.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 07.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 07.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.10.2019 | AT | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | RS | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | NO | 23.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 23.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9507700 (ARCH DEV CORP [US]) [Y] 1-32 * See page 1, lines 1-6, figures, page 12, 3rd paragraph, pages 14-18: phosphorothioates, and in particular amifostine (WR 2721) and WR 2065 protect against radiation damage. Hprt mutations are also prevented (see page 17) *; | [Y] - HUANG BINGSHENG ET AL, "Whole-body PET/CT scanning: estimation of radiation dose and cancer risk.", RADIOLOGY, (200904), vol. 251, no. 1, ISSN 1527-1315, pages 166 - 174, XP002670473 [Y] 1-32 * See page 166, "purpose", "results" and "conclusion", page 173, left hand column and table 5: PET / Computer tomography is accompanied by substantial radiation dose and cancer risk * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1148/radiol.2511081300 | [Y] - BENZ MARK G ET AL, "Reduction of cancer risk associated with pediatric computed tomography by the development of new technologies.", PEDIATRICS, (200407), vol. 114, no. 1, ISSN 1098-4275, pages 205 - 209, XP002670474 [Y] 1-32 * See page 205 left hand column, page 207 "conclusions" and page 208 left hand column: risks associated with pediatric computer tomography and strategies for their reduction * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1542/peds.114.1.205 | [Y] - HOSSEINIMEHR SEYED JALAL, "Potential utility of radioprotective agents in the practice of nuclear medicine.", CANCER BIOTHERAPY & RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, (200912), vol. 24, no. 6, ISSN 1557-8852, pages 723 - 731, XP002670475 [Y] 1-32 * See abstract and page 723: radioprotective agents reduce chromosomal aberration caused by gamma and beta rays produced by radiopharmaceuticals used for imaging purposes. See page 725, left hand column, reference to radiation used in PET tomography See page 728, right hand column: amifostine (WR 2721) protects from DNA damage caused by radiotherapy and radiology * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/CBR.2009.0635 | [XY] - MILLER G G ET AL, "Computed tomographic assessment of radiation induced damage in the lung of normal and WR 2721 protected LAF1 mice", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF RADIATION: ONCOLOGY BIOLOGY PHYSICS, PERGAMON PRESS, USA, vol. 12, no. 11, ISSN 0360-3016, (19861101), pages 1971 - 1975, (19861101), XP026843287 [X] 27 * See abstract, results and discussion: amifostine (WR 2721) reduces lung tissue damage (pneumonitis and fibrosis) induced by CT * [Y] 1-32 | [Y] - DZIEGIELEWSKI JAROSLAW ET AL, "WR-1065, the active metabolite of amifostine, mitigates radiation-induced delayed genomic instability.", FREE RADICAL BIOLOGY & MEDICINE, (20081215), vol. 45, no. 12, ISSN 0891-5849, pages 1674 - 1681, XP002670476 [Y] 1-32 * See abstract, page 1675 left hand column second paragraph, page 1676 ff "results", figures: WR 1065 the active metabolite of amifostine protects from immediate radiation damage, as well as delayed mutagenic effects measured by hyperrecombination and mutation in GTP construct and micronucleous formation in surviving cells. WR 1065 increases MnSOD levels. See pages 1678-1680 "discussion": WR 1065 protects from radiation-induced genomic instability and risk of cancerogenesis * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.FREERADBIOMED.2008.09.004 | [Y] - HOOKER ANTONY M ET AL, "Low doses of amifostine protect from chromosomal inversions in spleen in vivo when administered after an occupationally relevant X-radiation dose", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF LOW RADIATION, (2009), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 43 - 56, XP009156936 [Y] 1-32 * See abstract, page 46 and page 50: amifostine is the only FDA approved radioprotective compound. It protects from radiation mutagenesis, inducing the NFkB pathway mediated by MnSOD and in particular it protects from chromosomal inversion. Furthermore, (see page 50) its metabolite WR 1065 protects from Hprt mutations * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1504/IJLR.2009.026239 | [Y] - DZIEGIELEWSKI JAROSLAW ET AL, "Amifostine metabolite WR-1065 disrupts homologous recombination in mammalian cells.", RADIATION RESEARCH, (201002), vol. 173, no. 2, ISSN 1938-5404, pages 175 - 183, XP002670477 [Y] 1-32 * See abstract: WR 1065 decreases homologous recombination in response to DNA radiation damage preventing genomic instability * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1667/RR1982.1 | Examination | - Natsuhisa Oka ET AL, "Stereocontrolled Synthesis of Oligoribonucleoside Phosphorothioates by an Oxazaphospholidine Approach", Organic Letters, (20090219), vol. 11, no. 4, doi:10.1021/ol802910k, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 967 - 970, XP055179581 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol802910k | by applicant | US5488042 | US5567686 | US5869338 | US5891856 | US6984619 | - TUCKER, LUCKINBILL, RADIAL RES., (2011), vol. 175, no. 5, pages 631 - 7 | - BHATTI ET AL., RADIAL. ENVIRON. BIOPHYS., (2010), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 685 - 692 | - SIGURDSON ET AL., CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 68, no. 21, pages 8825 - 8831 | - KIM ET AL., CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 66, pages 10377 - 10383 | - MURLEY ET AL., RADIAT. RES., (2011), vol. 175, pages 57 - 65 | - KATAOKA ET AL., RADIAT. RES., (2007), vol. 168, pages 106 - 114 | - ROTHKAMM ET AL., RADIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 242, pages 244 - 251 | - KUMAR ET AL., RADIAT RES., (2006), vol. 165, no. 1, pages 43 - 50 | - JONES ET AL., RADIAT RES., (2002), vol. 158, no. 4, pages 424 - 42 | - PAMUJULA, S., J. PHARMACY PHARMACOL., (2004), vol. 56, pages 1119 - 1125 | - LAMPERTI ET AL., RADIATION RES., (1990), vol. 124, pages 194 - 200 | - SRINIVASAN ET AL., INT. J. RADIAT. BIOL., (2002), vol. 78, pages 535 - 543 | - J.S. MURLEY ET AL., RADIAT. RES., (2011), vol. 175, pages 57 - 65 | - J.S. MURLEY ET AL., RADIAT. RES., (2008), vol. 169, pages 495 - 505 | - BHATTI ET AL., RADIAT. ENVIRON. BIOPHYS., (2010), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 685 - 692 | - BRENNER ET AL., AM. J: ROENTGENOL., (2001), vol. 176, no. 2, pages 289 - 96 | - GIAMBARRESI, JACOBS, Military Radiobiology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1987), pages 265 - 301 | - GRDINA ET AL., CARCINOGENESIS, (1995), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 767 - 774 | - HUANG ET AL., MOLEC. CELL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 24, no. 11, pages 5060 - 5068 | - JONES ET AL., RADIAT. RES., (2002), vol. 158, no. 4, pages 424 - 42 | - KATAOKA ET AL., RADIAT. RES., (2007), vol. 168, pages 106 - 11 | - KUMAR ET AL., RADIAT. RES., (2006), vol. 165, no. 1, pages 43 - 50 | - LAMPERTI ET AL., RADIAT. RES., (1990), vol. 124, pages 194 - 200 | - LI ET AL., PROSTATE, (1998), vol. 35, pages 221 - 233 | - LIMOLI ET AL., CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, no. 18, pages 4048 - 4056 | - MARDER, MORGAN, MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 13, no. 11, pages 6667 - 6677 | - MORGAN, RADIAT. RES., (2003), vol. 159, no. 5, pages 567 - 580 | - MORGAN, RADIAT. RES., (2003), vol. 159, no. 5, pages 581 - 596 | - MURLEY ET AL., RADIAL. RES., (2002), vol. 158, no. 1, pages 101 - 109 | - MURLEY ET AL., RADIAT. RES., (2004), vol. 162, pages 536 - 546 | - MURLEY ET AL., FREE RADICAL. BIOL. MED., (2006), vol. 40, pages 1004 - 1016 | - MURLEY ET AL., RADIAT. RES., (2007), vol. 167, pages 465 - 474 | - MURLEY ET AL., RADIAL. RES., (2008), vol. 169, pages 495 - 505 | - NICKOLOFF, Encyclopedia of Cancer, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 4, pages 49 - 59 | - OBERLEY, SPITZ, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1984), vol. 105, pages 457 - 469 | - PAMUJULA, S. ET AL., J. PHARMACY PHARMACOL., (2004), vol. 56, pages 1119 - 25 | - ROTHKAMM ET AL., RADIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 242, pages 244 - 51 | - SEMELKA ET AL., J. MAGN. RESON. IMAGING, (2007), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 900 - 9 | - SMITH ET AL., HEALTH PHYS., (2003), vol. 85, no. 1, pages 23 - 29 | - SWEENEY, RADIOL. TECHNOL., (1979), vol. 51, no. 3, pages 321 - 7 | - TUCKER, LUCKINBILL, RADIAT RES., (2011), vol. 175, no. 5, pages 631 - 7 |