EP2560889 - BOX WITH BUILT-IN BAG. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hodges, Linda Kalsås Rollandslia 40 5115 Ulset / NO | [2013/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Acapo AS Edvard Griegs vei 1 5059 Bergen / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Acapo AS P.O. Box 1880 Nordnes 5817 Bergen / NO | Application number, filing date | 11772304.9 | 18.04.2011 | [2016/01] | WO2011NO00120 | Priority number, date | NO20100000548 | 18.04.2010 Original published format: NO 20100548 | [2013/09] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011133042 | Date: | 27.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2560889 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2560889 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 27.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/46, B65D85/18 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
B65D5/46008 (EP);
B65D85/187 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/09] | B65D5/46, B65D85/18, B65D65/28, B65D63/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHACHTEL MIT EINEM EINGEBAUTEN BEUTEL | [2013/09] | English: | BOX WITH BUILT-IN BAG. | [2013/09] | French: | BOÎTE COMPORTANT UN SAC À L'INTÉRIEUR DE CELLE-CI | [2013/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 30.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2011 | AL | 30.12.2015 | AT | 30.12.2015 | BE | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | CZ | 30.12.2015 | DK | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | ES | 30.12.2015 | FI | 30.12.2015 | HR | 30.12.2015 | IT | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MK | 30.12.2015 | NL | 30.12.2015 | PL | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SE | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | TR | 30.12.2015 | NO | 30.03.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | IE | 18.04.2016 | LU | 18.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 18.04.2011 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.04.2016 | ||
LU | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.04.2011 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.04.2016 | ||
LU | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.04.2011 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.04.2016 | ||
LU | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.04.2011 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.04.2016 | ||
LU | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.04.2016 | ||
LU | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LU | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LU | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LU | 18.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1400457 (TUTUNDJIAN LAURENT [BE], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0043] * * figure 14 *; | [A]EP0950616 (FEDELE MASSIMO [IT], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0017] , [0028] * * figure 2c *; | [A]DE8230735U (RUMA PLASTIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US1722052 (LACKEY ROBERT M) [A] 1-6 * figure 4 * | International search | [A]DE9200463U (CLEMENS, ANJA); | [A]DE9006895U (GAUMER, OLAF); | [A]US2006185993 (WILSKEY MICHAEL J) |