EP2561149 - WEAR ASSEMBLY FOR EXCAVATING EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/09] | COUPLING ASSEMBLIES WITH ENHANCED TAKE UP | ||
[2019/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESCO Group LLC 2141 NW 25th Avenue Portland, OR 97210 / US | [2018/46] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Esco Corporation 2141 NW 25th Avenue Portland, OR 97210-2578 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRISCOE, Terry, L. 11399 NW Ridge Road Portland OR 97229 / US | 02 /
STANGELAND, Kevin, S. 6703 SE 148th Avenue Portland OR 97236 / US | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Argyma 14 Boulevard de Strasbourg 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/24] | Argyma 36, rue d'Alsace Lorraine 31000 Toulouse / FR | ||
Former [2014/28] | Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/09] | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | Application number, filing date | 11772469.0 | 15.04.2011 | [2019/24] | WO2011US32634 | Priority number, date | US20100326155P | 20.04.2010 Original published format: US 326155 P | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011133411 | Date: | 27.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2561149 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2561149 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/28 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
E02F9/2841 (EP,KR,US);
E02F3/40 (KR);
E02F3/60 (KR);
E02F9/28 (KR);
E02F9/2833 (EP,US);
E02F9/2883 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLEISSEINRICHTUNG FÜR BAGGERAUSRÜSTUNG | [2019/01] | English: | WEAR ASSEMBLY FOR EXCAVATING EQUIPMENT | [2019/01] | French: | PIÈCE D'USURE POUR ÉQUIPEMENT D'EXCAVATION | [2019/01] |
Former [2013/09] | KOPPLUNG VON BAUGRUPPEN MIT VERSTÄRKTER ANHAFTUNG | ||
Former [2013/09] | COUPLING ASSEMBLIES WITH ENHANCED TAKE UP | ||
Former [2013/09] | ENSEMBLES DE COUPLAGE AVEC REPRISE AMÉLIORÉE | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 24.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19169639.2 / EP3536866 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2927387 (DROVER GLENN F) [A] 1,14 * figures 2,4 *; | [A]US3410010 (RATKOWSKI THOMAS A) [A] 1,14* column 3, line 18 - line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5964547 (BRINKLEY DAVID WAYNE [AU]) [Y] 2-5,15,16 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 28; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2004221491 (BRISCOE TERRY L [US]) [Y] 5,16 * paragraph [0073]; figure 23 *; | [XY]WO2007123653 (ESCO CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,14 * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0089]; figures 33-37 * [Y] 2-5,15,16 | International search | [A]US5964547 (BRINKLEY DAVID WAYNE [AU]); | [A]US2004216334 (EMRICH ROBERT K [US], et al); | [X]US2007137071 (MCCLANAHAN ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US2007137072 (BRISCOE TERRY L [US]) | by applicant | US3121289 | US4326348 | US4433496 | US5068986 | US5469648 | US5784813 | US5868518 | US5964547 | US6986216 | US7174661 | US7730652 |