EP2560545 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CALIBRATING RETINOSCOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sims, Clinton N. 3949 Evans Avenue Suite 106 Ft. Myers, Florida 33901 / US | [2013/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Hansen, Jochen Hansen und Heeschen Patentanwälte Eisenbahnstrasse 5 21680 Stade / DE | Application number, filing date | 11772602.6 | 20.04.2011 | WO2011US33177 | Priority number, date | US20100764216 | 21.04.2010 Original published format: US 764216 | [2013/34] |
Former [2013/13] | US201013090437 | 21.04.2010 | |
Former [2013/09] | US20100764216 | 21.04.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011133626 | Date: | 27.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2560545 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/12 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
G01M11/00 (EP,US);
A61B3/103 (EP,US);
A61B3/1208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KALIBRIERUNG VON RETINOSKOPEN | [2013/09] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CALIBRATING RETINOSCOPES | [2013/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉTALONNER DES RÉTINOSCOPES | [2013/09] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 25.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 14.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4856892 (BEN-TOVIM NATHAN [IL]) [A] 1,9* the whole document *; | [A]US7341350 (KADAMBI VIVEK [IN]) [A] 1,9 * column 6, line 63 - column 8, line 20 * | International search | [Y]GB1417775 (HEINE OPTOTECH KG); | [Y]US5650839 (SIMS CLINTON N [US]); | [Y]US6250761 (LITTLE MERVYN AUBREY [GB], et al) | by applicant | US5650839 |