EP2622351 - NEUROPEPTIDE Q AS MODULATOR OF GPCR GALR2 AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/32] | NEUROPEPTIDE Q AS MODULATOR OF GPCR GALR2 AND USES THEREOF | ||
[2014/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Gewerbestrasse 16 4123 Allschwil / CH | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEROY, Xavier c/o Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd Gewerbestrasse 16 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Gschwend, Thomas Peter, et al Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Legal Department Gewerbestrasse 16 4123 Allschwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Gschwend, Thomas Peter, et al Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Legal Department Gewerbestrasse 16 4123 Allschwil / CH | Application number, filing date | 11773875.7 | 23.09.2011 | WO2011IB54205 | Priority number, date | WO2010IB54369 | 28.09.2010 Original published format: PCT/IB2010/054369 | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012042455 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2622351 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2622351 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/566 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
G01N33/566 (EP,US);
G01N2333/5755 (EP,US);
G01N2500/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUROPEPTID Q ALS GPCR-GALR2-MODULATOR UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2014/17] | English: | NEUROPEPTIDE Q AS MODULATOR OF GPCR GALR2 AND USES THEREOF | [2014/17] | French: | NEUROPEPTIDE Q UTILISÉ COMME MODULATEUR DE GPCR GALR2 ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2014/17] |
Former [2013/32] | NEUROPEPTID Q ALS GPCR-GALR2-MODULATOR UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2013/32] | NEUROPEPTIDE Q AS MODULATOR OF GPCR GALR2 AND USES THEREOF | ||
Former [2013/32] | NEUROPEPTIDE Q UTILISÉ COMME MODULATEUR DE GPCR GALR2 ET SES UTILISATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 25.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2011 | AL | 27.08.2014 | AT | 27.08.2014 | BE | 27.08.2014 | CY | 27.08.2014 | CZ | 27.08.2014 | DK | 27.08.2014 | EE | 27.08.2014 | ES | 27.08.2014 | FI | 27.08.2014 | HR | 27.08.2014 | IT | 27.08.2014 | LT | 27.08.2014 | LV | 27.08.2014 | MC | 27.08.2014 | MK | 27.08.2014 | MT | 27.08.2014 | NL | 27.08.2014 | PL | 27.08.2014 | RO | 27.08.2014 | RS | 27.08.2014 | SE | 27.08.2014 | SI | 27.08.2014 | SK | 27.08.2014 | SM | 27.08.2014 | TR | 27.08.2014 | IE | 23.09.2014 | LU | 23.09.2014 | BG | 27.11.2014 | NO | 27.11.2014 | GR | 28.11.2014 | IS | 27.12.2014 | PT | 29.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.09.2011 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MK | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 23.09.2014 | ||
LU | 23.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 23.09.2011 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 23.09.2014 | ||
LU | 23.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.09.2011 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 23.09.2014 | ||
LU | 23.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.09.2011 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 23.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 23.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 23.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 23.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 23.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 27.08.2014 | |
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 27.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5972624 (SMITH KELLI E [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-6 * | [A] - WANG S ET AL, "MOLECULAR CLONING AND PHARMACOLOGICAL CHARACTERIZATION OF A NEW GALANIN RECEPTOR SUBTYPE", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, US, (19970101), vol. 52, ISSN 0026-895X, pages 337 - 343, XP002942077 [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 338, column 1, paragraph 5 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * figures 3-5; table 1 * | by applicant | WO02096934 | US2005221359 | US5919649 | US5888819 | US6004744 | US6013431 | US4873191 | FR2593827 | - HABERT-ORTOLI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 9780 - 9783 | - BURGEVIN ET AL., J. MOL. NEUROSCI., (1995), vol. 6, pages 33 - 41 | - HOWARD ET AL., FEBS LETTS., (1997), vol. 405, pages 285 - 290 | - SMITH ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 272, pages 24612 - 24616 | - WANG ET AL., MOL. PHARMACOL., (1997), vol. 52, pages 337 - 343 | - WANG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 31949 - 31953 | - AHMAD ET AL., ANN. N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (1998), vol. 863, pages 108 - 119 | - BLOOMQUIST ET AL., BIOPHYS. RES.COMMUN., (1998), vol. 243, pages 474 - 479 | - KOLAKOWSKI ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM., (1998), vol. 71, pages 2239 - 2251 | - SMITH ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 23321 - 23326 | - SMITH ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 24612 - 24616 | - O'DONNELL ET AL., J. COMP. NEUROL., (1999), vol. 409, pages 469 - 481 | - WATERS, KRAUSE, NEUROSCIENCE, (2000), vol. 95, pages 265 - 271 | - HAWES ET AL., J. COMP. NEUROL., (2004), vol. 479, pages 410 - 423 | - TATEMOTO ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1983), vol. 164, pages 124 - 128 | - FISONE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 7339 - 7343 | - MISANE ET AL., EUR. J. NEUROSCI., (1998), vol. 10, pages 1230 - 1240 | - PIERIBONE ET AL., NEUROSCI., (1995), vol. 64, pages 861 - 876 | - HOKFELT ET AL., ANN. N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (1998), vol. 863, pages 252 - 263 | - KINNEY ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (1998), vol. 18, pages 3489 - 3500 | - ZINI ET AL., EUR. J. PHARMACOL., (1993), vol. 245, pages 1 - 7 | - MASTROPAOLO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 85, pages 9841 - 9845 | - SAKURAI ET AL., NEUROSCI. LETT., (1996), vol. 212, pages 21 - 24 | - KINNEY ET AL., NEUROBIOL. LEARN. MEM., (2009), vol. 92, pages 429 - 438 | - MAZARATI ET AL., BRAIN RES., (1992), vol. 589, pages 164 - 166 | - WIESENFELD ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, no. 3, pages 334 - 3337 | - CRAWLEY, CELL. MOL. LIFE SCI., (2008), vol. 65, pages 1836 - 1841 | - HOKFELT ET AL., NEUROSCI. LETT., (1987), vol. 83, pages 217 - 220 | - VILLAR ET AL., NEUROSCI., (1990), vol. 36, pages 181 - 199 | - CORTES ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 7742 - 7746 | - HENDERSON, NEUROSCI. LETT., (1999), vol. 266, pages 41 - 44 | - BRECHT ET AL., BRAIN RES. MOL. BRAIN RES., (1997), vol. 48, pages 7 - 16 | - WERNER, COVENAS, INT J NEUROSCI., (2010), vol. 120, pages 455 - 70 | - WANG, GUSTAFSON, DRUG NEWS PERSPECT., (1998), vol. 11, pages 458 - 68 | - HABERT-ORTOLI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U S A., (1994), vol. 91, pages 9780 - 9783 | - SMITH, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 23321 - 23326 | - FATHI ET AL., BRAIN RES MOL BRAIN RES., (1997), vol. 51, pages 49 - 59 | - HOWARD ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1997), vol. 405, pages 285 - 290 | - WANG ET AL., MOL PHARMACOL., (1997), vol. 52, pages 337 - 343 | - WITTAU ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2000), vol. 19, pages 4199 - 4209 | - KANAZAWA ET AL., EXPERT OPIN. THER. TARGETS., (2010), vol. 14, pages 289 - 302 | - WU ET AL., EUR. J. PHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 482, pages 133 - 137 | - SAAR ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (2002), vol. 99, pages 7136 - 7141 | - ZACHARIOU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (2003), vol. 100, pages 9028 - 9033 | - ABRAMOV ET AL., NEUROPEPTIDES, (2003), vol. 38, pages 55 - 61 | - MAZARATI ET AL., J PHARMACOL EXP THER., (2006), vol. 318, pages 700 - 708 | - LIU ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2001), vol. 98, pages 9960 - 9964 | - LU ET AL., NEUROPEPTIDES, (2005), vol. 39, pages 143 - 146 | - MAZARATI ET AL., J NEUROCHEM, (2005), vol. 95, pages 1495 - 1503 | - WANG ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 37, pages 6711 - 6717 | - BRANCHEK ET AL., TRENDS PHARMACOL SCI, (2000), vol. 21, pages 109 - 117 | - LU ET AL., NEUROPEPTIDES., (2005), vol. 39, pages 143 - 146 | - LU ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2005), vol. 102, pages 874 - 879 | - HOKFELT ET AL., LANCET NEUROL., (2003), vol. 2, pages 463 - 472 | - CHANG ET AL., NAT. NEW. BIOL., (1971), vol. 232, pages 86 - 87 | - HOKFELT ET AL., NATURE, (1980), vol. 284, pages 525 - 521 | - KRAMER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 281, pages 1640 - 1645 | - MIRABEAU ET AL., GENOME RES., (2007), vol. 17, pages 320 - 327 | - TAJIB ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 18, pages 649 - 654 | - HUBBARD, COHN, J. CELL BIOL., (1975), vol. 64, pages 461 - 479 | - SALAMON ET AL., BIOPHYS. J., (1996), vol. 71, pages 283 - 294 | - MISHIZUMA, NAGATA, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 5322 | - GHATTAS ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 11, pages 5848 - 5859 | - KJELSBERG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 1430 - 1433 | - MCWHINNEY ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 2087 - 2097 | - REN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 16483 - 16487 | - PARMA ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 365, pages 649 - 651 | - SALAMON ET AL., BIOPHYS J., vol. 71, pages 283 - 294 | - BIOPHYS. J., (2001), vol. 80, pages 1557 - 1567 | - TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI., (1999), vol. 24, pages 213 - 219 | - SARRIO ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2000), vol. 20, pages 5164 - 5174 | - TRAYNOR, NAHORSKI, MOL. PHARMACOL., (1995), vol. 47, pages 848 - 854 | - STABLES ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 252, pages 115 - 126 | - DETHEUX ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2000), vol. 192, pages 1501 - 1508 | - KENIMER, NIRENBERG, MOL. PHARMACOL., (1981), vol. 20, pages 585 - 591 | - HORTON, BAXENDALE, METHODS MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 41, pages 91 - 105 | - RUDOLPH ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 11824 - 11831 | - KIKKAWA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1982), vol. 257, page 13341 | - PINNA, RUZZENE, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. ACTA., (1996), vol. 1314, pages 191 - 225 | - FINK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1988), vol. 85, pages 6662 - 6666 | - MONTMINY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1986), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 6682 - 6686 | - COMB ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 323, pages 353 - 356 | - SHORT ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 261, pages 9721 - 9726 | - HAFNER, BIOSENS. BIOELECTRON., (2000), vol. 15, pages 149 - 158 | - COSTAGLIOLA ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2000), vol. 105, pages 803 - 811 | - KOHLER, MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - KOZBAR ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1983), vol. 4, page 72 | - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, INC., (1985), pages 77 - 96 | - PALMITER, BRINSTER, ANN. REV. GENET., (1986), vol. 20, pages 465 - 499 | - HUSZAR ET AL., CELL, (1997), vol. 88, page 131 | - OHKI-HAMAZAKI ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 390, page 165 | - WAGNER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, page 4323 |