EP2566269 - BASE STATION APPARATUS, MOBILE TERMINAL APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEDA, Kazuaki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
MIKI, Nobuhiko c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
TAOKA, Hidekazu c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11774908.5 | 21.04.2011 | WO2011JP59846 | Priority number, date | JP20100105939 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010105939 | [2013/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011136125 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2566269 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
H04L1/1854 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0055 (KR);
H04W72/04 (KR,US);
H04B7/0697 (KR);
H04L1/0003 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0038 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/06 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/10] | H04W72/04, H04W28/04, H04J1/00, H04J11/00, H04J99/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG, MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2013/10] | English: | BASE STATION APPARATUS, MOBILE TERMINAL APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD | [2013/10] | French: | APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE, APPAREIL TERMINAL MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2012 | Translation filed | 26.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 22.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]CN101657018 (ZTE CORP) [Y] 14,16 * abstract * [A] 1-13,15,17; | [XYI] - NOKIA ET AL, "PHICH resources in LTE-Advanced", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-101412 PHICH RESOURCES IN LTE-ADVANCED, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100216), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20100222, XP050418880 [X] 1,7,13,14,16 * the whole document * [Y] 14,16 [I] 1-6,8-12,15,17 | [XI] - "LTE; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical channels and modulation (3GPP TS 36.211 version 9.1.0 Release 9)", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20100401), vol. 3GPP RAN 1, no. V9.1.0, XP014046895 [X] 1,7,13,14,16 * pages 47-48, section 6.3.2.2; page 57, section 6.9 * [I] 2-6,8-12,15,17 | [XI] - "3 rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical layer procedures (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.213, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100321), no. V9.1.0, pages 1 - 83, XP050401971 [X] 1,7,13,14,16 * pages 24-26, sections 7.1.6.1-7.1.63page 56, section 8; page 70, section 9.1.2 * [I] 2-6,8-12,15,17 | [A] - MOTOROLA, "DCI for uplink non-contiguous RB allocations", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-091349 - DCI FOR UL NON-CONTIG RA -, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090318), no. Seoul, Korea; 20090318, XP050338943 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - ERICSSON ET AL, "On PHICH for carrier aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-101725, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100407), vol. RAN WG1, no. Beijing, china; 20100412, XP050419657 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2009129343 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [A] - ERICSSON, "PHICH and HARQ timing and association for TDD", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #52BIS, RL-081524, (20080331), XP050109939 | [A] - RESEARCH IN MOTION UK LIMITED, "Relay Link HARQ Operation", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #59, R1-094464, (20091109), pages 1 - 8, XP050388889 | by applicant | JP20100105939 |